Marrero v. CITY OF NEW YORK et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul G Gardephe |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-12405 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Dec 31, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 29, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 29, 2019 5:33 AM EDT |
Defendant
Cynthia Brann
Department of Correction Commissioner NYC Department of Correction 100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007 |
|
Defendant
City of New York
|
|
Defendant
John Does ##1-5
|
|
Defendant
Captain Thomas
|
|
Plaintiff
David Marrero
Pamela S. Roth Law Office of Pamela S. Roth, Esq PC 2747 Coney Island Avenue
Brooklyn, NY 11235 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 29, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
4
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/29 4:08 PM
ORDER: For the reasons set forth herein, Plaintiff's claims are dismissed under Fed. R. Civ. P.41(b) for failure to prosecute. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate any pending motions and to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/29/2020) (jca) |
|
Friday, November 08, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 11/08 10:14 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff initiated this action on December 31, 2018 and filed an Amended Complaint on January 2, 2019. (See Dkt. Nos. 1,3) There has been no activity on the docket since Plaintiff filed the Amended Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff file proof of service on Defendants by November 22, 2019. If Plaintiff fails to do so, the Court will dismiss this case for failure to prosecute. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/8/2019) (js) |
|
Wednesday, January 02, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 01/02 11:57 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Roth, Pamela) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 01/02 11:41 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint,2 Amended Complaint, against Cynthia Brann, City of New York, John Does ##1-5, Thomas with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by David Marrero. Related document:1 Complaint,2 Amended Complaint,.(Roth, Pamela) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Wed 01/02 11:16 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Pamela Susan Roth. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Cynthia Brann, CITY OF NEW YORK, John Does 1-5, John Thomas. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted; party name entered incorrectly. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 01/02 11:18 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Pamela Susan Roth. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 01/02 11:20 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 01/02 11:21 AM
Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 01/02 11:22 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Wed 01/02 11:24 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Pamela Susan Roth to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf) |
||
Tuesday, January 01, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 01/01 12:54 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against David Marrero with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by David Marrero. Related document:1 Complaint.(Roth, Pamela) |
|
Monday, December 31, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 12/31 11:48 PM
COMPLAINT against Cynthia Brann, CITY OF NEW YORK, John Does 1-5, John Thomas. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16121666)Document filed by David Marrero.(Roth, Pamela) |