New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lorna G Schofield
Case #: 1:19-cv-00199
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:2601 FMLA: Family and Medical Leave Act (Findings and Purposes)
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2019
Terminated:Oct 10, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Jul 07, 2019 4:53 AM EDT
Defendant
CoCreativ Holdings LLC
32 Avenue of the Americas 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10013
Represented By
Alexandra Faver
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
David S. Greenhaus
Jackson Lewis P.C. (melville N.Y.)
contact info
Defendant
Pat Dermody
Represented By
David S. Greenhaus
Jackson Lewis P.C. (melville N.Y.)
contact info
Defendant
Industrial Color Productions, Inc.
32 Avenue of the Americas 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10013
Represented By
Alexandra Faver
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
David S. Greenhaus
Jackson Lewis P.C. (melville N.Y.)
contact info
Defendant
Paul Price
Represented By
David S. Greenhaus
Jackson Lewis P.C. (melville N.Y.)
contact info
Defendant
Click 3X, L.L.C.
Defendant
CoCreativ Corp.
Represented By
Alexandra Faver
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
David S. Greenhaus
Jackson Lewis P.C. (melville N.Y.)
contact info
Defendant
Frontenac X Private Capital Limited Partnership
Represented By
Alexandra Faver
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
David S. Greenhaus
Jackson Lewis P.C. (melville N.Y.)
contact info
Plaintiff
Jessica de Guardiola
623 Upper Grassy Hill Rd.
Woodbury, CT 06798
Represented By
Allison Lindsey Van Kampen
Vladeck Raskin & Clark, P.C.
contact info
Anne C. Vladeck
Vladeck, Raskin & Clark P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
C3X Partnership LLC
Terminated: 01/28/2019
32 Avenue of the Americas 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10013
Defendant
Frontenac Company LLP
Terminated: 01/28/2019
One South Wacker, Suite 2980
Chicago, IL 60606


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, January 03, 2020
68 68 order Stipulation and Order of Dismissal Fri 01/03 4:24 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and among Plaintiff, JESSICA DE GUARDIOLA, and Defendants INDUSTRIAL COLOR PRODUCTIONS, INC.; COCREATIV CORP.; COCREATIV HOLDINGS LLC; FRONTENAC X PRIVATE CAPITAL LIMITED PARTNERSHIP; PAUL PRICE; and PAT DERMODY, through their respective undersigned counsel, that the above-captioned action be dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice, and with no award of attorneys, fees, costs or disbursements by the Court to any party. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/3/2019) (jca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2020
67 67 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Thu 01/02 12:01 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by CoCreativ Corp., CoCreativ Holdings LLC, Pat Dermody, Frontenac X Private Capital Limited Partnership, Industrial Color Productions, Inc., Paul Price. (Faver, Alexandra)
Related: [-]