Connecticut District Court
Judge:Vanessa L Bryant
Case #: 3:19-cv-00031
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:791 Job Discrimination (Rehabilitation Act)
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2019
Terminated:Oct 02, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Jul 07, 2019 5:43 AM EDT
Defendant
City of Bridgeport
Represented By
John Patrick Bohannon, Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff
Brett T. Hyman
Represented By
Thomas W. Bucci
Willinger, Willinger & Bucci, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, August 28, 2020
31 31 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 08/28 11:37 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Brett T. Hyman. (Bucci, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2019
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Thu 10/03 8:20 AM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Shafer, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2019
30 30 order Order Wed 10/02 7:49 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE as settled. The parties have reported that this case has settled. Rather than continue to keep the case open on the docket, the Clerk is directed to terminate this file without prejudice to reopening on or before 21 days. If the parties wish to file a stipulation of dismissal for approval by the Court or simply for inclusion in the Court's file, they may do so on or before 21 days. The date set forth in this Order may be extended for good cause in accordance with Local Rule 7(b). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/2/2019.(Diamond, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2019
29 29 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 09/05 2:52 PM
ORDER denying28 Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendant's Motion to amend the Second Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents was filed after the Court's Order 27 denying the extension. Therefore, the Defendant is moving for reconsideration under Local Rule 7(c). Local Rule 7(c)(1) states: "motions for reconsideration shall not be routinely filed and shall satisfy the strict standard applicable to such motions. Such motions will generally be denied unless the movant can point to controlling decisions or data that the court overlooked in the initial decision or order." The Defendant's motion fails to satisfy the reconsideration standard. For these reasons and the reasons set forth in 27 , Defendant's motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 09/05/2019.(Diamond, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2019
28 28 motion Extension of Time Wed 09/04 11:27 AM
Amended MOTION for Extension of Time until October 2, 2019 respond to Request for Discovery by City of Bridgeport. (Bohannon, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2019
27 27 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 09/03 7:59 PM
ORDER denying26 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Request for Production. Local Rule 7(b) requires counsel to show why, in the exercise of due diligence, counsel was not able to meet the presumptively reasonable deadline established by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Court previously granted counsel's motion for an extension [Dkt. 20 ] from 08/02/2019 to 09/02/2019 to coordinate production among various City departments. At the close of the deadline, counsel sets forth the identical basis for the requesting a second extension. This fails to satisfy the good cause requirement of Local Rule 7(b). The Court notes that discovery closes on 11/01/2019. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 09/3/2019. (Diamond, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
26 26 motion Extension of Time Fri 08/30 8:40 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until October 2, 2019 respond to Request for Discovery by City of Bridgeport. (Bohannon, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2019
25 25 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 08/27 4:58 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert A. Richardson: Settlement Conference held on 8/27/2019. Case not settled, but parties are to report back by 9/6/19 as to progress made towards settlement. Total Time: 3 hours and 50 minutes. (Landsman, Halle)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2019
24 24 utility Calendar Entry Mon 08/05 12:54 PM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Conference set for 8/27/2019 01:00 PM in Chambers Room 258, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert A. Richardson. (Landsman, Halle)
Related: [-]
23 23 5 pgs order Order Mon 08/05 12:53 PM
ORDER. A settlement conference is scheduled for 8/27/19 at 1:00 PM with Judge Richardson. Please see attached order for important instructions. Signed by Judge Robert A. Richardson on 8/5/2019. (Landsman, Halle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2019
22 22 minutes Status Conference Wed 07/24 3:32 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant: Discovery status teleconference held on 7/24/2019. Total Time: 20 minutes. (Court Reporter F. Velez, ECRO.) (Shafer, J.)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 07/24 3:23 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert A. Richardson for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/24/2019. (Bryan, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2019
20 20 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 07/23 3:37 PM
ORDER granting18 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/23/2019. (Bryan, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
19 19 utility Calendar Entry Tue 07/23 3:36 PM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. RESET FROM 4:00 . Discovery status teleconference is now set for 7/24/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. To participate in the teleconference, the parties are ordered to call Chambers at 860-240-3123 with all parties on the line. In the alternative, the parties may call Chambers to distribute a dial-in number to the Court. (Shafer, J.)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Extension of Time Tue 07/23 9:33 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until September 2, 2019 Respond to Request for Production by City of Bridgeport. (Bohannon, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 22, 2019
17 17 respm Response Fri 02/22 12:10 PM
RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause filed by City of Bridgeport. (Bohannon, John)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/22 12:09 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by City of Bridgeport.(Bohannon, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 21, 2019
15 15 utility Calendar Entry Thu 02/21 10:26 AM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Discovery status teleconference set for 7/24/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. To participate in the teleconference, the parties are ordered to call Chambers at 860-240-3123 with all parties on the line. In the alternative, the parties may call Chambers to distribute a dial-in number to the Court. (Shafer, J.)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/21 9:03 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court has evaluated the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report13 and sets the following case management deadlines. A discovery status teleconference will take place on 07/24/2019 at 4:00 pm . All discovery, including but not limited to depositions of expert witnesses, shall be completed by 11/01/2019 . Dispositive motions are due by 12/02/2019 . If no dispositive motions are filed, the joint trial memorandum ("JTM") is due by 01/06/2020 , and jury selection will take place on 02/18/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. If dispositive motions are filed, the JTM is due by 10/02/2020 , and jury selection will take place on 11/17/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Counsel shall be prepared to present evidence on any day during the month after jury selection is scheduled to take place. The parties are directed to closely follow Chambers' Practices5 -- including the deadlines and format of filings -- when completing and filing the JTM, which shall be accompanied by the voir dire questions, jury instructions, and motions in limine . All evidentiary objections raised in the JTM must be the subject of a motion in limine and supported by applicable Second Circuit precedent. The parties' exhibit binders and electronic exhibits, as well as any courtroom technology requests, must be submitted no later than 2 weeks before jury selection. The Court also requests that any courtesy copies sent to Chambers be printed from the docket and contain the header of the Court's electronic filing system. If and/or when the parties feel that a settlement conference before a Magistrate Judge would be productive, the parties may jointly request such on the docket. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/21/2019.(Bryan, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
13 13 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 02/19 4:27 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bucci, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 15, 2019
12 12 order Order to Show Cause Fri 02/15 9:13 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE within seven days of the date of this order why default should not be entered in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). Plaintiff properly served Defendant and Defendant's Answer was due 2/1/2019. If Defendant does not comply with this order, the Clerk will enter default against Defendant. Show Cause Response due by 2/22/2019. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/15/2019. (Bryan, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 30, 2019
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/30 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Patrick Bohannon, Jr on behalf of City of Bridgeport (Bohannon, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 17, 2019
10 10 5 pgs order Order Thu 01/17 9:49 AM
ORDER re Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Clerk on 1/17/2019. (Shafer, J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 14, 2019
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/14 10:41 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brett T. Hyman. City of Bridgeport served on 1/11/2019, answer due 2/1/2019. (Bucci, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 09, 2019
8 8 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 01/09 11:48 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *City of Bridgeport* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thomas W. Bucci* *Willinger, Willinger & Bucci, P.C.* *855 Main St., Fifth Floor* *Bridgeport, CT 06604*. (Velez, F.)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Electronic Service Documents Wed 01/09 11:45 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of4 Standing Protective Order,6 Notice,2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,5 Order Re: Chambers Practices,3 Electronic Filing Order,1 Complaint filed by Brett T. Hyman. Signed by Clerk on 1/9/2019. (Velez, F.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 08, 2019
6 6 notice Notice Wed 01/09 11:42 AM
NOTICE re Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Clerk on 1/8/2019. (Velez, F.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
5 5 15 pgs order Order Re: Chambers Practices Wed 01/09 11:37 AM
ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/8/2019. (Velez, F.)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Protective Order Wed 01/09 11:36 AM
STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/8/2019. (Velez, F.)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Electronic Filing Order Wed 01/09 11:33 AM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/8/2019. (Velez, F.)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Wed 01/09 11:30 AM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/9/2019; Discovery due by 7/10/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 8/14/2019. Signed by Clerk on 01/08/2019. (Velez, F.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/08 12:01 PM
COMPLAINT against City of Bridgeport ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5110917.), filed by Brett T Hyman.(Bucci, Thomas)
Related: [-]
service Request to Issue Summons Tue 01/08 12:11 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to City of Bridgeport. (Bucci, Thomas)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 01/08 1:00 PM
Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]