Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-21848

Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:James R Sacca
Case #: 2:19-ap-02003
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2019
Terminated:Feb 05, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Quantum3 Group, LLC
Represented By
Quantum3 Group, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Nancy J. Whaley
Nancy J. Whaley, Standing Ch. 13 Trustee 303 Peachtree Center Avenue Suite 120, Suntrust Garden Plaza
Atlanta, GA 30303
Plaintiff
Joseph William Schollian
2755 Fran Mar Dr.
Gainesville, GA 30506
Represented By
Matthew Thomas Berry
Matthew T. Berry & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, February 05, 2019
misc Adversary Closed Tue 02/05 8:01 AM
Adversary 2:19-ap-2003 Closed (jwc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 04, 2019
4 4 motion Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary, Motion for Mon 02/04 1:31 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary filed by Matthew Thomas Berry on behalf of Joseph William Schollian. (Berry, Matthew) Modified on 2/5/2019 (jwc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 11, 2019
3 3 misc 0-Certificate of Service Fri 01/11 9:35 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Filed by Matthew Thomas Berry on behalf of Joseph William Schollian. Related [+] (Berry, Matthew) Modified on 1/14/2019 (jwc)
Related: [-] 1 2
Thursday, January 10, 2019
2 2 court Summons/Alias Summons Issued (auto) Thu 01/10 8:10 AM
Summons Issued on Quantum3 Group, LLC Answer Due 02/11/2019 (jwc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 09, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/09 9:05 AM
Adversary case 19-02003 Complaint against Quantum3 Group, LLC , 11 Related [+] Filed by Joseph William Schollian (Berry, Matthew)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 542 turnover of property
Att: 1 Exhibit Memorandum
Att: 2 Exhibit 1
Att: 3 Exhibit 2
Att: 4 Exhibit 3