Bashor v. Howmedica Osteonics et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Donovan W Frank |
Referred: | Becky R Thorson |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-00063 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332-pip-Diversity-Personal Injury, Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 11, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 08, 2019 4:47 AM CDT |
Defendant
Howmedica Osteonics
|
|
Defendant
Stryker Ireland Limited
|
|
Defendant
Stryker Sales Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Stryker Corp.
|
|
Plaintiff
Tom Bashor
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, February 11, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
order
Stryker - Order for Dismissal ADI
Tue 02/11 1:18 PM
ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE CERTAIN LAWSUITS IN WHICH DISMISSAL WITH TOLLING HAS BEEN AGREED TO BY THE PARTIES as to All Actions as Indicated in Amended Exhibit A. The pending matters identified in Amended Exhibit A hereto are hereby dismissed in their entirety without prejudice and without costs to any party pursuant to the tolling terms set forth in PTO #42. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 2/11/2020. (JAT) |
|
Thursday, February 21, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 02/21 10:49 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tom Bashor. Stryker Ireland Limited served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Nemo, Anthony) |
|
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice to Counsel to Comply with Pretrial Orders in Main MDL Case
Thu 01/10 9:36 AM
(Text-Only) COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file In re: Stryker Rejuvenate and ABG II Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, 0:13-md-02441-DWF-BRT . Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:13-md-2441-DWF-BRT . Additionally, access to Pretrial Orders, minutes, transcripts, and other documents issued in the master case may be found on the Stryker Rejuvenate MDL website at:[LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Stryker/index] . (JLB) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 01/10 9:35 AM
Summons Issued as to Howmedica Osteonics, Stryker Corp., Stryker Ireland Limited, Stryker Sales Corporation. (JLB) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Thu 01/10 9:34 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil MDL Direct Assign list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 16-cv-63 DWF/BRT. (JLB) |
|
Wednesday, January 09, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 01/09 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard R Schlueter on behalf of Tom Bashor. (Schlueter, Richard) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/09 4:08 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6596936) filed by Tom Bashor. Filer requests summons issued. (Schlueter, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |