New York Southern District Court
Case #: 1:14-cr-00068
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2014
Terminated:Jun 01, 2015
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 07, 2021 12:45 PM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Eun Young Choi
United States Attorney'S Office, Sdny
contact info
Michael Daniel Neff
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Sdny
contact info
Serrin Andrew Turner
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Timothy Turner Howard
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Sdny
contact info
Vladislav Vainberg
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Ross William Ulbricht (1)
Terminated: 06/01/2015
Represented By
Zachary Lee Newland
Brandon Sample, PLC
contact info
Brandon Sample
Brandon Sample PLC
contact info
Joshua Jacob Horowitz
Tech Law Ny
contact info
Lindsay Anne Lewis
contact info
Jay Leiderman
The Law Offices Of Jay Leiderman
contact info
Paul Grant
Law Office Of Paul Grant
contact info

Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 2:49 PM EDT
Friday, September 27, 2013
SEALED ORAL ORDER as to Sealed Defendant 1. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 9/27/2013)(dif) [1:13-mj-02328-UA]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1). In Violation of 21 U.S.C. 846, 18 U.S.C. 1030 & 1956 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas) (dif) [1:13-mj-02328-UA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2013
Arrest of Ross William Ulbright in the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (dif) [1:13-mj-02328-UA]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2013
3 3 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Ross William Ulbright from the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (dif) [1:13-mj-02328-UA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2013
Arrest of Ross William Ulbright. (dif) [1:13-mj-02328-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2013
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis: Initial Appearance as to Ross William Ulbright held on 11/6/2013., Deft Appears with Retained Attorney Joshua Dratel and AUSA Serrin Turner for the government. Detention Hearing Scheduled for 11/21/13 at 11:00 AM; ( Preliminary Hearing set for 12/6/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Unassigned.) (dif) [1:13-mj-02328-UA]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Retained Attorney Joshua Lewis Dratel appearing for Ross William Ulbright. (dif) [1:13-mj-02328-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2013
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox: Detention Hearing as to Ross William Ulbright held on 11/21/2013. Deft Appears with Retained Attorney Joshua Dratel and AUSA Serrin Turner for the government. Detention. The Defendant Did Not Overcome The Presumption That There Are No Conditions That Can Be Fashioned to Permit Him To Be At Liberty While The Criminal Action is Pending. Clear and Convincing Evid That The Defendant Sought To Have Several Persons Murdered Was Presented To The Court Which Demonstrate The Defendant Presents As A Danger To The Community. In Addition Considerable Un-Rebutted Evid Was Presented That The Defendant Has The Resources To Flee and Previously Acquired Many False Identification Documents That Would Permit Him to Flee. Furthermore He Has Used an Alias Previously. (dif) [1:13-mj-02328-UA]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2013
5 5 SEALED DOCUMENTS FILED as to Ross William Ulbright.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 11/22/2013)(dif) [1:13-mj-02328-UA]
Related: [-]
6 6 LETTER as to Ross William Ulbright addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Joshua Dratel, Esq dated 11/19/2013 re: USA v Ross William Ulbright, 13 Mag 2328.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 11/22/2013) (Docket and File(dif) [1:13-mj-02328-UA] (Entered: 11/26/2013)
Related: [-]
7 7 LETTER as to Ross William Ulbright addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Joshua Dratel, Esq dated 11/20/2013 re: USA v Ross William Ulbright, 13 Mag 2328.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 11/22/2013) (Docket and File)(dif) [1:13-mj-02328-UA]
Related: [-]
8 8 LETTER as to Ross William Ulbright addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from AUSA Serrin Turner dated 11/20/2013 re: USA v Ross William Ulbright, 13 Mag 2328.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 11/22/2013) (Docket and File)(dif) Modified on 12/4/2013 (jm). [1:13-mj-02328-UA]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2013
9 9 AFFIRMATION of Serrin Turner in Support by USA as to Ross William Ulbright, the government is requesting a 30-day continuance until 1/6/14.(jbo) [1:13-mj-02328-UA]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Ross William Ulbright. Time excluded from 12/6/13 until 1/6/14. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 12/6/13)(jbo) [1:13-mj-02328-UA]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2014
ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Ross William Ulbright re: 10 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. Time excluded from 1/6/2014 until 2/4/2014. Follows oral order of 1/6/2014. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/6/2014) (ajc) [1:13-mj-02328-UA]
Related: [-]
11 11 AFFIRMATION of AUSA Serrin Turner in Support by USA as to Ross William Ulbright, the Government is requesting a 30 continuance until 2/4/2014. (ajc) [1:13-mj-02328-UA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2014
Case Designated ECF as to Ross William Ulbright. (jbo)
Related: [-]
12 12 12 pgs INDICTMENT FILED as to Ross William Ulbricht (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4. (jbo)
Related: [-]