Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:18-cr-02585
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2018
Last checked: Friday Jan 11, 2019 12:40 AM MST
Defendant
Dennis Singleton (1)
Represented By
Lance Justin Wood
Marchetti Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Nathaniel Jacob Walters
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info
Carin C Duryee
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/25/2019 8:13 AM MST
Thursday, November 15, 2018
Arrest of Dennis Singleton on 11/15/2018. (ADI-DLC, ) [4:18-mj-03537-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 16, 2018
1 1 2 pgs COMPLAINT as to Dennis Singleton. (ADI-DLC, ) [4:18-mj-03537-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
2 2 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman: Initial Appearance as to Dennis Singleton held on 11/16/2018. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. Appointing Lance Justin Wood for Dennis Singleton with Appointment Type: CJA. Defendant state true name to be the same. Defendant declined to be interviewed by Pretrial Services. Pretrial Services will interview defendant after court this date. Defendant is temporarily detained and remanded to custody of U.S. Marshals. Appearances : AUSA Anna Wright(duty) for the Government, CJA Attorney Laura Conover for CJA Attorney Lance Wood for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Detention/Preliminary Hearing set for 11/20/2018 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau. Related [+] Hearing held 02:40 pm to 03:30 pm. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ABU) [4:18-mj-03537-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
Monday, November 19, 2018
4 4 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Dennis Singleton. (MFR) [4:18-mj-03537-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 20, 2018
6 6 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. Rateau: Detention Hearing as to Dennis Singleton held on 11/20/2018. Pretrial Services recommends release and the Government does not object. Defense counsel orally motions the Court for the Defendant to be released to the third party custody of his mother as opposed to a residential treatment and arguments of counsel are heard as to same. Pretrial Services is heard. The Court states its findings on the record and the Defendant is ordered released on his own recognizance with conditions as set forth in the Order Setting Conditions of Release signed and filed this date. Defense counsel moves for the Defendant to be allowed extended visits for the holidays and discussion is held as to same. The Court shall allow extended visitation as stated on the record. The Preliminary Hearing is waived. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. The Magistrate case referral is Judge Markovich. Assigning attorney Carin C. Duryee for USA. Appearances : AUSA, Nathaniel Walters on behalf of Carin Duryee for the Government; CJA Attorney, Lance Wood for Defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Interpreter N/A. Related [+] Hearing held 10:30 a.m. to 11:11 a.m. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CXE) [4:18-mj-03537-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
7 7 4 pgs ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to Dennis Singleton. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. Rateau on 11/20/2018.(CXE) Modified on 11/26/2018 to correct docket text(CXE). [4:18-mj-03537-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
8 8 1 pgs NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nathaniel J. Walters appearing for USA . (Walters, Nathaniel) [4:18-mj-03537-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 12, 2018
9 9 3 pgs INDICTMENT Related [+] as to Dennis Singleton (1) count(s) 1, 2. Counsel is advised as to Arraignment set for 12/28/2018 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman. TRIAL date is 2/5/2019 at 9:30 AM, PLEA DEADLINE set 1/18/2019. NOTE: Notice of Intent to waive Defendant's Presence at Arraignment shall be filed not later than Wednesday prior to arraignment. (KEP)
Related: [-] dacted for Public Disclosure
11 11 SEALED UNREDACTED INDICTMENT as to Dennis Singleton. (ADI-KAH, )
Related: [-]