New York Southern District Court
Judge:J Paul Oetken
Case #: 1:19-cv-00322
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Other
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2019
Terminated:Apr 22, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 10, 2019 5:07 AM EDT
Defendant
Sara Losoviz, R.N.
Represented By
Jonathan Samuel Hershberg
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info
Laurent Scott Drogin
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Benjamin Paul, M.D.
Represented By
Jonathan Samuel Hershberg
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info
Laurent Scott Drogin
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info
Defendant
David Rosenberg, M.D.
Represented By
Jonathan Samuel Hershberg
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info
Laurent Scott Drogin
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Michael Shifrin
Represented By
Jonathan Samuel Hershberg
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info
Laurent Scott Drogin
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info
Defendant
David Rosenberg, M.D., PLLC,
Represented By
Jonathan Samuel Hershberg
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info
Laurent Scott Drogin
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria Erin O'Shea
Represented By
Jessica Massimi
Phillips & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, April 22, 2019
25 25 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Mon 04/22 11:21 AM
ORDER: The Court has been informed that the parties have reached a settlement in principle of this case. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to the Court's calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made within thirty days. All filing deadlines and conference dates are adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/22/2019) (ama)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2019
adr Mediator Session Held Fri 04/19 4:45 PM
Mediator Session Held on 4/18/19 at 40 Foley Square.(ah)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2019
utility Calendar Entry Fri 04/12 12:14 PM
NOTICE: THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 30, 2019 AT 11:00 A.M. WILL BE HELD ON MAY 3, 2019 AT 4:15 P.M. (bh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 13, 2019
adr Mediator Session Scheduled Wed 02/13 12:05 PM
MEDIATOR SESSION SCHEDULED First Mediation Session scheduled for 4/18/19, 10 A.M. at 40 Foley Square.(ah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 12, 2019
23 23 order Order on Motion to Expedite Tue 02/12 11:25 AM
ORDER denying19 Letter Motion to Expedite. DENIED. PLAINTIFF SHALL RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION PURSUANT TO THE TIMELINE ESTABLISHED BY FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 36(A)(3). PLAINTIFF IS NOT PREJUDICED FROM OBJECTING TO DEFENDANTS' REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ON SUBSTANTIVE GROUNDS. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Tue 02/12 11:24 AM
ORDER denying as moot21 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. DENIED AS MOOT. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 11, 2019
21 21 motion Leave to File Document Mon 02/11 4:38 PM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Reply to February 11, 2019 letter by Plaintiff's Counsel addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Laurent S. Drogin dated February 11, 2019. Document filed by David Rosenberg, M.D., PLLC,, Sara Losoviz, R.N., Benjamin Paul, M.D., David Rosenberg, M.D., Michael Shifrin.(Drogin, Laurent)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 02/11 2:58 PM
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Jessica Massimi, Esq. dated February 11, 2019 re:19 LETTER MOTION to Expedite time for Plaintiff to respond to the RFA's addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Laurent S. Drogin dated February 8, 2019. . Document filed by Maria Erin O'Shea. (Massimi, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 08, 2019
19 19 motion Expedite Fri 02/08 5:16 PM
LETTER MOTION to Expedite time for Plaintiff to respond to the RFA's addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Laurent S. Drogin dated February 8, 2019. Document filed by David Rosenberg, M.D., PLLC,, Sara Losoviz, R.N., Benjamin Paul, M.D., David Rosenberg, M.D., Michael Shifrin.(Drogin, Laurent)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 06, 2019
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Wed 02/06 12:10 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 3/8/2019.(mf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 05, 2019
18 18 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/05 3:55 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by David Rosenberg, M.D., PLLC,.(Hershberg, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
17 17 6 pgs order Order of Automatic Referral to Mediation Tue 02/05 10:47 AM
ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (http://nysd.uscourts.gov/mediation). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 2/15/2019. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (mf)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 01, 2019
16 16 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Fri 02/01 3:31 PM
ORDER : Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on April 30, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. The conference will be held in Courtroom 706 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Court House, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Counsel who appear at the pretrial conference must be authorized to negotiate terms of settlement. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 4/30/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 706, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge J. Paul Oetken.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 2/1/19) (yv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 31, 2019
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/31 5:04 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,. Document filed by David Rosenberg, M.D., PLLC,, Sara Losoviz, R.N., Benjamin Paul, M.D., David Rosenberg, M.D., Michael Shifrin.(Hershberg, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 14, 2019
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/14 2:07 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Samuel Hershberg on behalf of David Rosenberg, M.D., PLLC,, Sara Losoviz, R.N., Benjamin Paul, M.D., David Rosenberg, M.D., Michael Shifrin. (Hershberg, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/14 1:54 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laurent Scott Drogin on behalf of David Rosenberg, M.D., PLLC,, Sara Losoviz, R.N., Benjamin Paul, M.D., David Rosenberg, M.D., Michael Shifrin. (Drogin, Laurent)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Issued Mon 01/14 1:47 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Rosenberg, M.D.. (pc) (Main Document 12 replaced on 1/14/2019) (pc)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued Mon 01/14 1:42 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Rosenberg, M.D., PLLC,. (pc)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued Mon 01/14 1:41 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Benjamin Paul, M.D.. (pc)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued Mon 01/14 1:38 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Shifrin. (pc)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Mon 01/14 1:37 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sara Losoviz, R.N.. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 01/14 8:52 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jessica Massimi. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: David Rosenberg, M.D., PLLC, d/b/a Manhattan Aesthetics, d/b/a Manhattan Facial Surgical Suites, PLLC, Sara Losoviz, R.N., Benjamin Paul, M.D., David Rosenberg, M.D., Michael Shifrin.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 01/14 8:56 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 01/14 8:57 AM
Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 01/14 8:57 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 11, 2019
7 7 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 01/11 3:58 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Massimi, Jessica)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 01/11 3:58 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MICHAEL SHIFRIN, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maria Erin O'Shea. (Massimi, Jessica)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 01/11 3:56 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DAVID ROSENBERG, M.D., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maria Erin O'Shea. (Massimi, Jessica)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 01/11 3:55 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DAVID ROSENBERG, M.D., PLLC, d/b/a MANHATTAN AESTHETICS, d/b/a MANHATTAN FACIAL SURGICAL SUITES, PLLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maria Erin O'Shea. (Massimi, Jessica)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 01/11 3:53 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Benjamin Paul, M.D., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maria Erin O'Shea. (Massimi, Jessica)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 01/11 3:53 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sara Losoviz, R.N., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maria Erin O'Shea. (Massimi, Jessica)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/11 3:50 PM
COMPLAINT against David Rosenberg, M.D., PLLC, d/b/a Manhattan Aesthetics, d/b/a Manhattan Facial Surgical Suites, PLLC, Sara Losoviz, R.N., Benjamin Paul, M.D., David Rosenberg, M.D., Michael Shifrin. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16179204)Document filed by Maria Erin O'Shea.(Massimi, Jessica)
Related: [-]