B. et al v. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPNAY et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Cathy Bissoon |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-00031 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2019 |
Terminated: | Sep 26, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 10, 2019 4:43 AM EDT |
Defendant
UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
KOBELL, GERALD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AMY B.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RICHARD B.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
T. SEBASTIAN B.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, December 17, 2019 | ||
55 | 55
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 12/17 7:58 PM
ORDER approving54 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 12/17/19. (dcd) |
|
54 | 54
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal (Atty)
Tue 12/17 5:16 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by AMY B., RICHARD B., T. SEBASTIAN B.. (King, Brian) |