City of Fort Lauderdale, Florida v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46329 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 14, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Florida Southern, 0:18-cv-62830 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:04 PM EST |
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Elizabeth LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Kadian LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis South Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Totowa LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Sales, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Orlando, Florida Distribution, LLC
|
|
Defendant
CVS Vero, Florida Distribution, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith LLC
|
|
Defendant
Health Mart Systems, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
One Johnson & Johnson
New Brunswick, NJ 08933 |
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Fort Lauderdale, Florida
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 4:41 PM EDT |
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against ACTAVIS LLC, ALLERGAN PLC F/K/A ACTAVIS PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, CVS Orlando, Florida Distribution, L.L.C., CVS Vero, Florida Distribution, L.L.C., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H.D. Smith, LLC d/b/a HD Smith f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Health Mart Systems, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC. N/K/A JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. N/K/A JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Specgx LLC, THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Walgreen Co., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11176530, filed by City of Fort Lauderdale, Florida.(Gilbert, Robert) [Transferred from flsd on 12/14/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2) [Transferred from flsd on 12/14/2018.] | |
3 | 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case.Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (ar2) [Transferred from flsd on 12/14/2018.] | |
4 | 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (ar2) [Transferred from flsd on 12/14/2018.] | |
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 Order Requiring Counsel to Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/21/2018. See attached document for full details. (ar2) [Transferred from flsd on 12/14/2018.] | |
Wednesday, December 05, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on1 Complaint,,,, into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Wal-Mart, Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Gilbert, Robert) [Transferred from flsd on 12/14/2018.] | |
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
Civil Case Terminated per DE7 Conditional Transfer Order. Closing Case. (mc) [Transferred from flsd on 12/14/2018.] | ||
7 | 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-70) transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio re: MDL 2804 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. (Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel). (mc) [Transferred from flsd on 12/14/2018.] | |
8 | 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Florida Southern. Case number 0:18-cv-62830. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |