Commissioners of St. Mary's County, Maryland v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46334 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 14, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Maryland, 8:18-cv-03597 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:05 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Anda Inc
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
J.M. Smith Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Commissioners of St. Mary's County, Maryland
41770 Baldridge Street
Leonardtown, MD 20650 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:36 PM EDT |
Friday, November 23, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT Commissioners of St. Mary's County, Maryland against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7686280.), filed by Commissioners of St. Mary's County, Maryland.(Poole, David) [Transferred from mdd on 12/14/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Cover Letter Line to Clerk re Issue of Summonses and Request for Transfer Order, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment Entry of Appearance, | ||
Att: 4 Attachment Notice of Lengthy Filing | ||
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 QC NOTICE:1 Complaint, filed by Commissioners of St. Mary's County, Maryland was filed incorrectly. ** Please docket the Entry of Appearance as a separate filing using the Civil Event- Notice of Appearance (km4s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 12/14/2018.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David Bruce Poole, Sr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Poole, David) [Transferred from mdd on 12/14/2018.] | |
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 11/29/2018. (heps, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 12/14/2018.] | |
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi on 12/14/2018. (kns, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 12/14/2018.] | |
6 | 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Maryland. Case number 8:18-cv-03597. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |