NextEngine Inc. v. NextEngine, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Maria A Audero |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-00249 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2019 |
Terminated: | Sep 15, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 10, 2019 1:31 AM PDT |
Defendant
Mark S. Knighton
1920 La Mesa Drive
Santa Monica, CA 90402 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NextEngine, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NextEngine Inc.
246 West Broadway
New York, NY 10013 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, September 16, 2021 | ||
91 | 91
misc
Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
Thu 09/16 9:06 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (gk) |
|
Att: 1 Final Judgment | ||
Wednesday, September 15, 2021 | ||
90 | 90
judgmentCV
Judgment
Thu 09/16 9:03 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER STIPULATED FACTS TRIAL by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Based upon the Findings of Fact and Conclusions88 , it is hereby ORDERED, AJUDGED, AND DECREED that JUDGMENT is entered on all counts in favor of Defendants NextEngine, Inc. and Mark S. Knighton, and against Plaintiff NextEngine, Inc. Plaintiff is not entitled to any relief from Defendants and shall take nothing by its suit. This is a FINAL JUDGMENT. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (gk) |