National Family Farm Coalition, et al v. USEPA, et al
Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-ag-70115 |
Type | agency / review |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 03, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 15, 2020 10:22 AM PST |
Amicus Curiae
SAVE OUR CROPS COALITION, FAMILY FARM DEFENDERS, FARM AND RANCH FREEDOM ALLIANCE, IOWA ORGANIC ASSOCIATION, KANSAS RURAL CENTER, and ORGANIC FARMERS ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
DAVID A. MORTENSEN, Ph. D., Professor and Chair of Weed and Applied Plant Ecology, Department of Agriculture, Nutrition, and Food Systems at University of New Hampshire, Durham, New Hampshire
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
NATIONAL FAMILY FARM COALITION
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
PESTICIDE ACTION NETWORK NORTH AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
ANDREW WHEELER, in his official capacity as Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Respondent-Intervenor
MONSANTO COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
1. | BASF, Corteva file motions to intervene in federal court case that vacated dicamba registrations (agriculture.com) |
Submitted Tue 08/11/2020 | |
Docket last updated: 06/04/2020 3:02 AM PDT |
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 FILED PETITION FOR REVIEW. DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. NOTIFIED RESPONDENTS OF FILING. SEND MQ: Yes. Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/18/2019. Petitioner brief due 04/01/2019 for Center for Biological Diversity, Center for Food Safety, National Family Farm Coalition and Pesticide Action Network North America. Respondent brief due 05/01/2019 for U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and Andrew Wheeler. Petitioner's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11150713] (WL) [Entered: 01/11/2019 03:36 PM] | |
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Mediation Letter | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs Mediation Questionnaire | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs Mediation Questionnaire Instructions | ||
Att: 5 20 pgs Case Opening Packet | ||
Att: 6 4 pgs Petition for Review | ||
Att: 7 25 pgs Exhibit A | ||
Att: 8 1 pgs Certificate of Service | ||
2 | 2 2 pgs Filed (ECF) Petitioners Center for Biological Diversity, Center for Food Safety, National Family Farm Coalition and Pesticide Action Network North America corporate disclosure statement. Date of service: 01/11/2019. [11150818] 19-70115 (Kimbrell, George) [Entered: 01/11/2019 04:30 PM] |