Shopko Gift Card Co., LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 8:19-bk-80064
Lead case is: 8:19-bk-80064
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:19-bk-80070 |
Case Filed: | Jan 16, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 28, 2022 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50,001-100,000 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, March 28, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
order
Final Decree
Mon 03/28 11:56 AM
Order and Final Decree Closing Certain of the Chapter 11 Cases. ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT: The Clerk of the Court shall enter this Order individually on the docket of the Subsidiary Cases and thereafter such docket shall be marked as "Closed". ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (See PDF) (law) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case 9 11 12
Mon 03/28 12:31 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed . (nmw) |
||
Wednesday, March 04, 2020 | ||
utility
Corrective Entry-Wrong Case
Wed 03/04 7:38 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: THE PROOF OF CLAIM #1 WAS FILED IN THIS CASE IN ERROR. ALL CLAIMS MUST BE FILED IN THE LEAD CASE 19-80064 (nmw) |
||
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs
Fri 02/22 6:15 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by Michael T. Eversden on behalf of Shopko Gift Card Co., LLC. (Eversden, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Schedule A/B
Fri 02/22 6:06 PM
Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule D: Non-Individual- Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual , Schedule G: Non-Individual- Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H: Non-Individual- Codebtors Filed by Michael T. Eversden on behalf of Shopko Gift Card Co., LLC. (Eversden, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
order
Joint Administration
Wed 01/16 9:48 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration Filed by Debtor . An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Bankruptcy Rules for the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska directing joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of: Specialty Retail Shops Holding Corp. (0029); Pamida Stores Operating Co., LLC (6157); Pamida Transportation LLC (4219); Penn-Daniels, LLC (0040); Places Associates Expansion, LLC (7526); Retained R/E SPE, LLC (6679); Shopko Finance, LLC (1152); ShopKo Gift Card Co., LLC (2161); ShopKo Holding Company, LLC 0171); ShopKo Institutional Care Services Co., LLC (7112); ShopKo Optical Manufacturing, LLC (6346); ShopKo Properties, LLC (0865); ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC (6109); SVS Trucking, LLC (0592). The docket in Case No. 19-80064 TLS should be consulted for all matters affecting this case . ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Text Only Order) (law) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Joint Administration
Wed 01/16 8:50 AM
Motion for Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor Shopko Gift Card Co., LLC (Niemeier, James) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 01/16 7:50 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 19-80070 ) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7775783, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
27
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 01/16 7:49 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717. Incomplete Filings due by 01/30/2019. Chapter 11 Plan due by 05/16/2019. Disclosure Statement due by 05/16/2019. Filed by James J Niemeier of McGrath, North, Mullin & Kratz, P.C. on behalf of Shopko Gift Card Co., LLC.(Niemeier, James) |
|
court
Case Reassigned
Wed 01/16 7:51 AM
Judge Thomas L. Saladino added to case. Involvement of Judge Shon Hastings Terminated . (cde) |