City of Quincy v. Purdue Pharma, LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45008 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jan 16, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Massachusetts, 1:18-cv-12627 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:05 PM EST |
Defendant
Jonathan Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kathe Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Richard Sackler
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SpecGx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
50 West Broad St., Suite 1330
Columbus, OH 43215 |
|
Defendant
Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Elizabeth LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Kadian LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis South Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Totowa LLC
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Sales, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
John and Jane Does 1-50
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Quincy
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 9:05 PM EDT |
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7467197 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(O'Connor, Brien) [Transferred from mad on 1/16/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
2 | 2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC. (O'Connor, Brien) [Transferred from mad on 1/16/2019.] | |
3 | 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt plc for Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC.. (O'Connor, Brien) [Transferred from mad on 1/16/2019.] | |
4 | 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew O'Connor on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, SPECGX LLC (O'Connor, Andrew) [Transferred from mad on 1/16/2019.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John O. Mirick on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Mirick, John) [Transferred from mad on 1/16/2019.] | |
Monday, December 24, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (adminn, ) [Transferred from mad on 1/16/2019.] | |
7 | 7 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (DaSilva, Carolina) [Transferred from mad on 1/16/2019.] | |
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time [Manufacturer Defendants' Assented-To Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond] by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, SPECGX LLC.(O'Connor, Brien) [Transferred from mad on 1/16/2019.] | |
Monday, December 31, 2018 | ||
9 | 9 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part8 Motion for Extension of Time. The court extends the Manufacturer Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 21 (twenty-one) days after a judicial decision on any remand motion or a conditional transfer by the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation. (Zierk, Marsha) [Transferred from mad on 1/16/2019.] | |
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
10 | 10 Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 74 in MDL Case 2804 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from mad on 1/16/2019.] | |
11 | 11 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number CTO - 74 in MDL Case 2804 received from the Northern District of Ohio requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Pacho, Arnold) [Transferred from mad on 1/16/2019.] | |
12 | 12 Case transferred to the Northern District of Ohio pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 1/15/19. Case transferred electronically to the Clerk in that district. (Pacho, Arnold) [Transferred from mad on 1/16/2019.] | |
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
13 | 13 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Massachusetts. Case number 1:18-cv-12627. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |