Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust, v. Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10124
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10124
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin J Carey |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-50025 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 15, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 19, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 19, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 06/19 10:08 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50025 Closed (AJL) |
||
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Dismissal - Notice
Tue 06/18 3:59 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust, (Alberto, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
11 | 11
court
Case Reassigned
Tue 06/18 9:14 AM
Order of Reassignment of Judge Signed 6/18/2019. Judge Karen B. Owens added to case. Involvement of Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon Terminated (BA) |
|
Friday, May 03, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
court
Case Reassigned
Fri 05/03 9:30 AM
Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case. Involvement of Judge Kevin J. Carey Terminated (SH) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 04/11 11:58 AM
Certificate of Service Re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on April 16, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,. (Alberto, Justin) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
Wed 04/10 3:18 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by LSC Wind Down, LLC, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,. Hearing scheduled for 4/16/2019 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (O'Neill, James) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/28 12:24 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,. (Alberto, Justin) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
9
pgs
order
Order
Wed 03/27 2:52 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Order Signed on 3/27/2019 (LMD) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Counsel (Multi)
Mon 03/25 3:12 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,. (Alberto, Justin) |
|
Wednesday, February 20, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Wed 02/20 2:48 PM
Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,. Hearing scheduled for 4/16/2019 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 3/6/2019. (Alberto, Justin) Modified docket text on 2/21/2019 (LMD) |
|
Wednesday, January 23, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Wed 01/23 2:20 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2019 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 3/25/2019. (Alberto, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 01/16 8:46 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50025 KJC) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9166843, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Tue 01/15 2:37 PM
Adversary case 19-50025 Complaint by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust, against Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 04/15/2019. (Alberto, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice Of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |