Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust, v. KSC Studio, L.L.C.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10124
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10124
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin J Carey |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-50052 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 15, 2019 |
Terminated: | Sep 16, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
KSC Studio, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 16, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 09/16 9:40 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50052 Closed (SS) |
||
Tuesday, September 15, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 09/15 11:16 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal // Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,. (Flasser, Gregory) |
|
Friday, January 24, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
mediation
Settled Prior to Mediation
Fri 01/24 12:51 PM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 03/24/2020. (Bifferato, Ian) |
|
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Mediation - Notice
Wed 12/18 10:02 AM
Notice of Mediation Filed by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust, (Alberto, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, December 17, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Selection of Mediator - Notice
Tue 12/17 2:28 PM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust, (Alberto, Justin) |
|
Tuesday, September 17, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Service
Tue 09/17 4:36 PM
Notice of Service Re: Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to KSC Studio L.L.C.'s, First Set of Requests for Production and Interrogatories Filed by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust, (Alberto, Justin) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Service
Fri 06/28 5:33 PM
Notice of Service of Defendants Written Discovery Requests Filed by KSC Studio, L.L.C. (Silverberg, Paul) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 06/25 3:47 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on June 27, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust. (Alberto, Justin) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Tue 06/25 11:51 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Plan Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 6/27/2019 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (O'Neill, James) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
court
Case Reassigned
Tue 06/18 9:18 AM
Order of Reassignment of Judge Signed 6/18/2019. Judge Karen B. Owens added to case. Involvement of Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon Terminated (BA) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Service
Fri 05/24 12:42 PM
Notice of Service Re: Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust, (Alberto, Justin) |
|
Friday, May 10, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 05/10 6:04 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by KSC Studio, L.L.C. (Silverberg, Paul) |
|
Friday, May 03, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
court
Case Reassigned
Fri 05/03 9:33 AM
Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case. Involvement of Judge Kevin J. Carey Terminated (SH) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 04/11 11:58 AM
Certificate of Service Re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on April 16, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,. (Alberto, Justin) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
Wed 04/10 3:18 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by LSC Wind Down, LLC, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,. Hearing scheduled for 4/16/2019 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (O'Neill, James) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/28 12:24 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,. (Alberto, Justin) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
10
pgs
order
Order
Wed 03/27 3:03 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Order Signed on 3/27/2019 (LMD) Modified on 3/28/2019 (SH) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Counsel (Multi)
Mon 03/25 3:12 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,. (Alberto, Justin) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Appearance - Notice
Fri 03/08 2:16 PM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by KSC Studio, L.L.C. (Silverberg, Paul) |
|
Wednesday, February 20, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Wed 02/20 2:48 PM
Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,. Hearing scheduled for 4/16/2019 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 3/6/2019. (Alberto, Justin) Modified docket text on 2/21/2019 (LMD) |
|
Wednesday, January 23, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Wed 01/23 3:00 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant KSC Studio, L.L.C.. Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2019 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 3/25/2019. (Alberto, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 01/16 8:46 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50052 KJC) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9166843, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Tue 01/15 3:44 PM
Adversary case 19-50052 Complaint by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust, against KSC Studio, L.L.C.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 04/15/2019. (Alberto, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice Of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |