Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust, v. Moov Corporation
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10124
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10124
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin J Carey |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-50059 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 15, 2019 |
Terminated: | Aug 29, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Moov Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 29, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 08/29 11:39 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50059 Closed (AJL) |
||
Wednesday, August 28, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Stipulation
Wed 08/28 11:41 AM
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Between Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust, and Moov Corporation . Filed by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,. (Alberto, Justin) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 06/25 3:47 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on June 27, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust. (Alberto, Justin) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Tue 06/25 11:51 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Plan Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 6/27/2019 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (O'Neill, James) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Service
Tue 06/25 11:43 AM
Notice of Service Re: Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Moov Corporation's, First Set of Request for Admissions Filed by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust, (Alberto, Justin) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
court
Case Reassigned
Tue 06/18 9:18 AM
Order of Reassignment of Judge Signed 6/18/2019. Judge Karen B. Owens added to case. Involvement of Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon Terminated (BA) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Service
Fri 05/24 12:43 PM
Notice of Service Re: Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust, (Alberto, Justin) |
|
Friday, May 03, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
court
Case Reassigned
Fri 05/03 9:33 AM
Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case. Involvement of Judge Kevin J. Carey Terminated (SH) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Substitution of Counsel- Notice
Wed 05/01 11:54 PM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel Filed by Moov Corporation (Austria, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 04/11 11:58 AM
Certificate of Service Re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on April 16, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,. (Alberto, Justin) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
Wed 04/10 3:18 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by LSC Wind Down, LLC, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,, Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,. Hearing scheduled for 4/16/2019 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (O'Neill, James) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/28 12:24 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,. (Alberto, Justin) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
10
pgs
order
Order
Wed 03/27 3:03 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Order Signed on 3/27/2019 (LMD) Modified on 3/28/2019 (SH) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Counsel (Multi)
Mon 03/25 3:12 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,. (Alberto, Justin) |
|
Thursday, February 21, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 02/21 4:22 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Moov Corporation Mediation due date: 06/21/2019.(Austria, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, February 20, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Approve - Motion
Wed 02/20 2:48 PM
Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,. Hearing scheduled for 4/16/2019 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 3/6/2019. (Alberto, Justin) Modified docket text on 2/21/2019 (LMD) |
|
Wednesday, January 23, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Wed 01/23 3:13 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Moov Corporation. Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2019 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 3/25/2019. (Alberto, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 01/16 8:46 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50059 KJC) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9166843, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Tue 01/15 3:56 PM
Adversary case 19-50059 Complaint by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust, against Moov Corporation. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 04/15/2019. (Alberto, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice Of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |