Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust, v. Rexel USA, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10124
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10124
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin J Carey |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-50067 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 15, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 16, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Rexel USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Withdrawal of Document - Notice
Wed 01/16 11:54 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Complaint Filed by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust, (Alberto, Justin) |
|
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Wed 01/16 8:48 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50067 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9166906, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Case Reassigned
Wed 01/16 8:15 AM
Judge Kevin J. Carey added to case. Involvement of Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon Terminated (LMD) |
|
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Tue 01/15 4:23 PM
WITHDRAWN 1/16/2019 Adversary case 19-50067 Complaint by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust, against Rexel USA, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 04/15/2019. (Alberto, Justin) Modified docket text on 1/16/2019 (LMD) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice Of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |