Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust, v. Sparks Custom Retail LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10124
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10124
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin J Carey |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-50072 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 15, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 11, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Sparks Custom Retail LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust,
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 04/11 8:08 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50072 Closed (LMD) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Dismissal - Notice
Wed 04/10 1:43 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust, (Alberto, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, April 09, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
VAN-417 Notice and Order of Request for Status Report
Tue 04/09 9:38 AM
Notice and Order of Request for Status Report with Certificate of Service. Status Report due by 4/30/2019. Signed on 4/9/2019. (LMD) |
|
Wednesday, January 23, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Wed 01/23 3:24 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Sparks Custom Retail LLC. Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2019 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 3/25/2019. (Alberto, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 01/16 8:48 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50072 KJC) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9166906, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Tue 01/15 4:37 PM
Adversary case 19-50072 Complaint by Limited Creditors' Liquidating Trust, against Sparks Custom Retail LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 04/15/2019. (Alberto, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice Of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |