DeGiacomo v. Scafuri
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-13328
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-13328
Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Frank J Bailey |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01006 |
Nature of Suit | 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 15, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 07, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Louis Scafuri
31445 Juliana Farms Road
San Juan Capistrano, CA 92675 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark G. DeGiacomo
Chapter 7 Trustee Murtha Cullina LLP 99 High Street, 20th Floor
Boston, MA 02110 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:07 PM EDT |
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Fri 06/07 11:11 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 19-01006 Complaint: Judgment for Plaintiff. (jreg) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 06/07 11:12 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1006 Closed (jreg) |
||
Saturday, May 25, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 05/26 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 05/25/2019. (Admin.) |
|
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 05/26 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 05/25/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
Judgment
Thu 05/23 9:49 AM
Judgment dated 5/23/2019. Re:12 Motion filed by Plaintiff Mark G. DeGiacomo for Default Judgment on Defendant(s) Louis Scafuri. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECLARED THAT THE PLAINTIFF, MARK G. DEGIACOMO, THE CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE OF RMA STRATEGIC OPPORTUNITY FUND, LLC SHALL RECOVER FROM THE DEFENDANT LOUIS SCAFURI THE AMOUNT OF $29.062.00. See Judgment for full text. (jreg) |
|
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Thu 05/23 9:25 AM
Order dated 5/23/2019 Re:12 Motion filed by Plaintiff Mark G. DeGiacomo for Default Judgment on Defendant(s) Louis Scafuri. NO RESPONSE HAVING BEEN FILED, AND GOOD CAUSE HAVING BEEN STATED, THE COURT WILL ENTER A DEFAULT JUDGMENT. (jreg) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 04/26 4:34 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Mark G. DeGiacomo for Default Judgment on Defendant(s) Louis Scafuri with certificate of service (Horne, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Judgment | ||
Monday, April 01, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Mon 04/01 12:32 PM
Order dated 4/1/2019 Re:10 Assented to Motion filed by Plaintiff Mark G. DeGiacomo to Extend Time to Comply with Re:8 Order. GRANTED. THE TIME IS EXTENDED TO APRIL 26, 2019. (jreg) |
|
utility
Update Answer Deadline
Mon 04/01 12:35 PM
Defendant Louis Scafuri Answer Deadline Reset for 4/26/2019 (jreg) |
||
Friday, March 29, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extend Time
Fri 03/29 2:48 PM
Assented to Motion filed by Plaintiff Mark G. DeGiacomo to Extend Time to Comply [Re:8 Order] with certificate of service. (Horne, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 03/21 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 03/20/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/18 10:48 AM
Order dated 3/18/2019 Re:3 Summons. NO ANSWER OR STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT HAVING BEEN FILED, AND THE DEFENDANT'S DEFAULT HAVING ENTERED ON FEBRUARY 15, 2019, AND NO FURTHER ACTION HAVING BEEN TAKEN HEREIN, THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS THAT THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING WILL BE DISMISSED FOR NONPROSECUTION WITHOUT FURTHER PROCESS UNLESS, ON OR BEFORE APRIL 1, 2019, (1) THE PARTIES FILE IN THE BANKRUPTCY CASE A STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AS TO THE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING AND A MOTION TO APPROVE THE STIPULATION, (2) THE PLAINTIFF MOVES FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, OR (3) THE DEFENDANT ANSWERS THE COMPLAINT AND MOVES TO VACATE THE DEFAULT. (jreg) |
|
Friday, February 15, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
court
Clerk's Entry of Default
Fri 02/15 11:25 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant Louis Scafuri. (jreg) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 01/16 2:01 PM
Summons Service Executed on Louis Scafuri 1/16/2019 (Horne, Jonathan) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 01/16 9:20 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Michael Connolly with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff Mark G. DeGiacomo (Connolly, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 01/16 8:17 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jonathan Horne with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff Mark G. DeGiacomo (Horne, Jonathan) |
|
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Tue 01/15 2:29 PM
Summons Issued on Louis Scafuri. Answer Due 2/14/2019. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (jreg) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Adversary Cover Sheet
Tue 01/15 2:03 PM
Adversary Cover Sheet filed by Plaintiff Mark G. DeGiacomo (DeGiacomo, Mark) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/15 1:59 PM
Adversary case 19-01006 Complaint by Mark G. DeGiacomo against Louis Scafuri. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))(DeGiacomo, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 |