Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:18-bk-10735

Kansas Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert E Nugent
Case #: 6:19-ap-05008
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2019
Terminated:Apr 01, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Best Buy/CBNA
50 Northwest Point Road
Elk Grove Village, IL 60007
Represented By
Best Buy/CBNA
contact info
Plaintiff
Linda S. Parks, Chapter 7 Trustee
Hite Fanning & Honeyman LLP 100 N Broadway Suite 950
Wichita, KS 67202
Represented By
Linda S. Parks
Hite Fanning & Honeyman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, September 05, 2019
court Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto) Thu 09/05 9:45 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint. Receipt number 144995, Fee Amount $350.00. (adiuser)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Mon 04/01 3:50 PM
Adversary Case 6:19-ap-5008 Closed . (waa)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 09, 2019
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 03/09 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 03/09/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Judgment
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 03/09 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 03/09/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 03/06 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 03/06/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Clerk's Entry of Default
9 9 order Judgment Wed 03/06 5:35 PM
Judgment Signed on 3/6/2019 (wmd)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Default Judgment Wed 03/06 5:33 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Related [+] Signed on 3/6/2019. (wmd)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
7 7 motion Default Judgment Tue 03/05 4:16 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Linda S. Parks (^Parks1, Linda)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 03, 2019
6 6 court Clerk's Entry of Default Sun 03/03 5:28 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Best Buy/CBNA. Related [+]. (wmd)
Related: [-] 5 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Filed by Linda S. Parks . (^Parks1, Linda) filed by Plaintiff Linda S. Parks
Friday, March 01, 2019
5 5 misc Request For Clerk's Entry of Default Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7055(a) and FRCP 55(a) Fri 03/01 4:26 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Filed by Linda S. Parks . (^Parks1, Linda)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 18, 2019
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 01/18 2:54 PM
Summons Service Executed on Best Buy/CBNA 1/18/2019 (^Parks1, Linda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 16, 2019
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 01/16 9:29 AM
Summons Issued on Best Buy/CBNA Date Issued 1/16/2019, Answer Due 2/15/2019 . (waa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 15, 2019
2 2 cmp Summons Request Tue 01/15 3:33 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons(es) by Linda S. Parks - summons(es) requested on Best Buy/CBNA (^Parks2, Linda)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/15 3:30 PM
Adversary case 19-05008 Complaint by Linda S. Parks on behalf of Linda S. Parks against Best Buy/CBNA. Receipt Number Deferred, Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (^Parks2, Linda)
Related: [-]