Gemstone Solutions RS, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 3:19-bk-30258
Lead case is: 3:19-bk-30258
Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Keith L Phillips |
Case #: | 3:19-bk-30249 |
Case Filed: | Jan 16, 2019 |
Terminated: | Sep 18, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 5,001-10,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Gymboree Retail Stores, LLC
71 Stevenson St Ste 2200
San Francisco, CA 94105-2979 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
John P. Fitzgerald, III
Office of the US Trustee - Region 4 -R 701 E. Broad Street, Ste. 4304
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Docket last updated: 38 minutes ago |
Monday, October 11, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Statement
Mon 10/11 2:06 PM
Statement Notice of Filing of Copy of Official Claims Register (Gemstone Solutions RS, LLC) filed by Brian H. Richardson of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Gemstone Solutions RS, LLC. (Richardson, Brian) |
|
Monday, December 07, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 12/07 10:00 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Thomas Joseph Moran of Wright, Constable & Skeen, LLP on behalf of REEP-RTL DTC VA LLC. (Moran, Thomas) |
|
Friday, September 18, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
order
Final Decree
Fri 09/18 9:33 AM
Final Decree Closing Certain Affiliate Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 350(A) and Bankruptcy Rule 3022. (Smith, Linda) |
|
Thursday, September 17, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
court
Reopen Case
Thu 09/17 3:19 PM
Reopen Case [Closed Due to an Administrative Error] (Smith, Linda) |
|
Tuesday, September 15, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
court
Case Closed - Chapter 11
Tue 09/15 11:58 AM
Case Closed. The Chapter 11 case having been fully administered, the case is hereby closed. (Smith, Linda) |
|
Friday, September 11, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Final Report and Motion for Final Decree
Fri 09/11 11:01 AM
Final Report and Motion for Final Decree Reorganized Debtors' Motion to Close Certain Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 350(a) and Bankruptcy Rule 3022 filed by Brian H. Richardson of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Gemstone Solutions RS, LLC. (Richardson, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
Friday, August 09, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
order
Directing
Fri 08/09 10:17 AM
An Order has been entered in this case directing that the caption of this case be changed in accordance with the corporate name change of Gymboree Retail Stores, LLC to Gemstone Solutions RS, LLC. (Baumgartner, Cindy) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Request for Notice/Service
Tue 04/23 3:45 PM
Request for Notice/Service filed by Chatham County Tax Commissioner. (Baumgartner, Cindy) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
crditcrd
none
Mon 03/18 10:19 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Amended Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), List(s) 19-30249 KLP) [misc,2011amd] ( 31.00) filing fee. Receipt number 30107550, amount $ 31.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Amended Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), List(s)
Mon 03/18 10:12 PM
Amended Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s) Filed: Schedule E/F,, filed by Brian H. Richardson of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Gymboree Retail Stores, LLC. (Richardson, Brian) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists
Fri 03/01 9:33 PM
Non-Individual Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists (Statement of Financial Affairs) filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Gymboree Retail Stores, LLC. (Condyles, Michael) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists
Fri 03/01 9:32 PM
Non-Individual Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Gymboree Retail Stores, LLC. (Condyles, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 02/06 11:16 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Donald C. Cowan Jr. on behalf of Eastview Mall, LLC. (Smith, Linda) |
|
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Joint Administration
Thu 01/17 3:58 PM
Order Granting Motion for Joint Administration , with Case Number 19-30248 19-30250 19-30251 19-30252 19-30253 19-30254 19-30255 19-30256 19-30257 19-30258 An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Bankruptcy Rules for the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of Virginia directing joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of: Gymboree Group, Inc. (6587); Gymboree Intermediate Corporation (1473); Gymboree Holding Corporation (0315); Gymboree Wholesale, Inc. (6588); Gym-Mark, Inc. (6459); Gymboree Operations, Inc. (6463); Gymboree Distribution, Inc. (8669); Gymboree Manufacturing, Inc. (6464); Gymboree Retail Stores, LLC (6461); Gym-Card, LLC (5720); and Gymboree Island, LLC (1215)]. The docket in Case No. 19-30258 (KLP) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (Baumgartner, Cindy) |
|
5 | 5
court
Hearing held
Thu 01/17 1:50 PM
Hearing held; Motion GRANTED; LEAD CASE: 19-30258 Appearance(s): Michael Condyles (Rintye, Peggy) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance (Attorney Users Only)
Thu 01/17 12:59 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Brian M Muchinsky of Nold & Associates, PLLC on behalf of Bellevue Square, LLC.(Muchinsky, Brian) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Joint Administration
Thu 01/17 3:22 AM
Motion for Joint Administration with 19-30248 19-30250 19-30251 19-30252 19-30253 19-30254 19-30255 19-30256 19-30257 & 19-30258 filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Gymboree Retail Stores, LLC. (Condyles, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 01/17 12:05 AM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition 19-30249 [misc,824] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 29750522, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
28
pgs
misc
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition
Wed 01/16 11:49 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Gymboree Retail Stores, LLC. (Condyles, Michael) |