Gemstone Solutions Distribution, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 3:19-bk-30258
Lead case is: 3:19-bk-30258
Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Keith L Phillips |
Case #: | 3:19-bk-30250 |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2019 |
Terminated: | Sep 18, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 100-199 |
Est. Assets | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Est. Liabilities | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Gymboree Distribution, Inc.
71 Stevenson St
San Francisco, CA 94105-2934 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
John P. Fitzgerald, III
Office of the US Trustee - Region 4 -R 701 E. Broad Street, Ste. 4304
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago |
Monday, October 11, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Statement
Mon 10/11 1:50 PM
Statement Notice of Filing of Copy of Official Claims Register (Gemstone Solutions Distribution, Inc.) filed by Brian H. Richardson of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Gemstone Solutions Distribution, Inc.. (Richardson, Brian) |
|
Friday, September 18, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
order
Final Decree
Fri 09/18 9:32 AM
Final Decree Closing Certain Affiliate Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 350(A) and Bankruptcy Rule 3022. (Smith, Linda) |
|
Thursday, September 17, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
court
Reopen Case
Thu 09/17 3:18 PM
Reopen Case [Closed Due to an Administrative Error] (Smith, Linda) |
|
Tuesday, September 15, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
court
Case Closed - Chapter 11
Tue 09/15 11:57 AM
Case Closed. The Chapter 11 case having been fully administered, the case is hereby closed. (Smith, Linda) |
|
Friday, September 11, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Final Report and Motion for Final Decree
Fri 09/11 10:59 AM
Final Report and Motion for Final Decree Reorganized Debtors' Motion to Close Certain Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 350(a) and Bankruptcy Rule 3022 filed by Brian H. Richardson of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Gemstone Solutions Distribution, Inc.. (Richardson, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
Friday, August 09, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Directing
Fri 08/09 10:18 AM
An Order has been entered in this case directing that the caption of this case be changed in accordance with the corporate name change of Gymboree Distribution, Inc. to Gemstone Solutions Distribution, Inc. (Baumgartner, Cindy) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
claims
Verification of Claims Register Upon Expiration of Claims Deadline
Fri 07/19 11:58 AM
Verification of Claims Register Upon Expiration of Claims Deadline (Baumgartner, Cindy) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists
Fri 03/01 9:36 PM
Non-Individual Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists (Statement of Financial Affairs) filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Gymboree Distribution, Inc.. (Condyles, Michael) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists
Fri 03/01 9:35 PM
Non-Individual Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Gymboree Distribution, Inc.. (Condyles, Michael) |
|
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Joint Administration
Thu 01/17 4:02 PM
Order Granting Motion for Joint Administration ,with Case Number 19-30248 19-30249 19-30251 19-30252 19-30253 19-30254 19-30255 19-30256 19-30257 19-30258 An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Bankruptcy Rules for the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of Virginia directing joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of: Gymboree Group, Inc. (6587); Gymboree Intermediate Corporation (1473); Gymboree Holding Corporation (0315); Gymboree Wholesale, Inc. (6588); Gym-Mark, Inc. (6459); Gymboree Operations, Inc. (6463); Gymboree Distribution, Inc. (8669); Gymboree Manufacturing, Inc. (6464); Gymboree Retail Stores, LLC (6461); Gym-Card, LLC (5720); and Gymboree Island, LLC (1215)]. The docket in Case No. 19-30258 (KLP) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (Baumgartner, Cindy) |
|
4 | 4
court
Hearing held
Thu 01/17 1:48 PM
Hearing held; Motion GRANTED; LEAD CASE: 19-30258 Appearance(s): Michael Condyles (Rintye, Peggy) |
|
3 | 3
16
pgs
motion
Joint Administration
Thu 01/17 3:24 AM
Motion for Joint Administration with 19-30248 19-30249 19-30251 19-30252 19-30253 19-30254 19-30255 19-30256 19-30257 & 19-30258 filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Gymboree Distribution, Inc.. (Condyles, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 01/17 12:27 AM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition 19-30250 [misc,824] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 29750530, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
29
pgs
misc
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition
Thu 01/17 12:09 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Gymboree Distribution, Inc.. (Condyles, Michael) |