Gemstone Solutions Holding Corporation
Member Case
Lead case is: 3:19-bk-30258
Lead case is: 3:19-bk-30258
Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Keith L Phillips |
Case #: | 3:19-bk-30257 |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2019 |
Terminated: | Sep 18, 2020 |
Type | Other Entity Type |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $0 to $50,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Gymboree Holding Corporation
71 Stevenson St Ste 2200
San Francisco, CA 94105-2979 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
John P. Fitzgerald, III
Office of the US Trustee - Region 4 -R 701 E. Broad Street, Ste. 4304
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Docket last updated: 28 minutes ago |
Monday, October 11, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Statement Notice of Filing of Copy of Official Claims Register (Gemstone Solutions Holding Corporation) filed by Brian H. Richardson of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Gemstone Solutions Holding Corporation. (Richardson, Brian) |
|
Friday, September 18, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Final Decree Closing Certain Affiliate Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 350(A) and Bankruptcy Rule 3022. (Smith, Linda) |
|
Thursday, September 17, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
court
Reopen Case
Thu 09/17 3:13 PM
Reopen Case [Closed Due to an Administrative Error] (Smith, Linda) |
|
Tuesday, September 15, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
court
Case Closed - Chapter 11
Tue 09/15 11:53 AM
Case Closed. The Chapter 11 case having been fully administered, the case is hereby closed. (Smith, Linda) |
|
Friday, September 11, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Final Report and Motion for Final Decree Reorganized Debtors' Motion to Close Certain Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 350(a) and Bankruptcy Rule 3022 filed by Brian H. Richardson of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Gemstone Solutions Holding Corporation. (Richardson, Brian) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, August 09, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Directing
Fri 08/09 10:24 AM
An Order has been entered in this case directing that the caption of this case be changed in accordance with the corporate name change of Gymboree Holding Corporation to Gemstone Solutions Holding Corporation. (Baumgartner, Cindy) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
claims
Verification of Claims Register Upon Expiration of Claims Deadline
Fri 07/19 1:16 PM
Verification of Claims Register Upon Expiration of Claims Deadline (Baumgartner, Cindy) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Non-Individual Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists (Statement of Financial Affairs) filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Gymboree Holding Corporation. (Condyles, Michael) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Non-Individual Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Gymboree Holding Corporation. (Condyles, Michael) |
|
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Order Granting Motion for Joint Administration , with Case Number 19-30248 19-30249 19-30250 19-30251 19-30252 19-30253 19-30254 19-30255 19-30256 19-30258 An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Bankruptcy Rules for the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of Virginia directing joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of: Gymboree Group, Inc. (6587); Gymboree Intermediate Corporation (1473); Gymboree Holding Corporation (0315); Gymboree Wholesale, Inc. (6588); Gym-Mark, Inc. (6459); Gymboree Operations, Inc. (6463); Gymboree Distribution, Inc. (8669); Gymboree Manufacturing, Inc. (6464); Gymboree Retail Stores, LLC (6461); Gym-Card, LLC (5720); and Gymboree Island, LLC (1215)]. The docket in Case No. 19-30258 (KLP) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (Baumgartner, Cindy) |
|
4 | 4
court
Hearing held
Thu 01/17 1:52 PM
Hearing held; Motion GRANTED; LEAD CASE: 19-30258 Appearance(s): Michael Condyles (Rintye, Peggy) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Motion for Joint Administration with 19-30248 19-30249 19-30250 19-30251 19-30252 19-30253 19-30254 19-30255 19-30256 & 19-30258 filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Gymboree Holding Corporation. (Condyles, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 01/17 12:36 AM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition 19-30257 [misc,824] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 29751033, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Gymboree Holding Corporation. (Condyles, Michael) |