Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:18-bk-18956

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Scott H Yun
Case #: 6:19-ap-01014
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2019
Terminated:Nov 26, 2019
Last checked: Monday May 10, 2021 6:50 PM PDT
Defendant
Maxine Gilliam
Represented By
Todd L Turoci
The Turoci Firm
contact info
Maxine Gilliam
contact info
Plaintiff
La Randa Ross
10424 Ruthelen Street
Los Angeles, CA 90047
Represented By
George M Halimi
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
31 31 court Request for a Certified Copy (Internal user) Tue 07/27 3:54 PM
Request for a Certified Copy Fee Amount $11. Related [+] (Zamora, Ed)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff La Randa Ross
30 30 court Request for a Certified Copy (Internal user) Tue 07/27 3:53 PM
Request for a Certified Copy Fee Amount $11. Related [+] (Zamora, Ed)
Related: [-] 20 Stipulation filed by Defendant Maxine Gilliam
29 29 court Request for a Certified Copy (Internal user) Tue 07/27 3:51 PM
Request for a Certified Copy Fee Amount $11. Related [+] (Zamora, Ed)
Related: [-] 25 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Tue 07/27 9:30 PM
Receipt of Certification Fee - $33.00 by 13. Receipt Number 60150437. (admin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2019
28 28 court Close Adversary Case Tue 11/26 4:11 PM
Adversary Case 6:19-ap-1014 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Hawkinson, Susan)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2019
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Mon 10/14 2:00 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/11/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, October 09, 2019
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 10/09 9:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/09/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)
25 25 2 pgs order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Wed 10/09 2:47 PM
ORDER Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Signed on 10/9/2019 Related [+]. (Potier, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff La Randa Ross,11 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF)
Monday, October 07, 2019
24 24 4 pgs misc Notice of Lodgment Mon 10/07 4:21 PM
Notice of lodgment Order Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendant Maxine Gilliam Related [+]. (Turoci, Todd)
Related: [-] 20 Stipulation By Maxine Gilliam and La Randa E. Ross to Dismiss the Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Filed by Defendant Maxine Gilliam filed by Defendant Maxine Gilliam
23 23 1 pgs order Continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF) Mon 10/07 1:44 PM
ORDER to continue/reschedule Pre-Trial Conference re: Complaint for Determination of Dischargeability and Objection to Debtor's Discharge hearing (BNC-PDF) Related [+] - To All Interested Parties: The hearing is hereby rescheduled from October 24, 2019 at 1:30 pm to October 31, 2019 at 1:30 pm, in Courtroom 302. Signed on 10/7/2019 (Potier, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 1
22 22 misc Proof of service Mon 10/07 11:32 AM
Proof of service Personal Delivery of Judge's Copy Filed by Defendant Maxine Gilliam Related [+]. (Turoci, Todd)
Related: [-] 20 Stipulation By Maxine Gilliam and La Randa E. Ross to Dismiss the Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice
court Hearing Continued (Other) Mon 10/07 2:10 PM
Hearing (Adv Other) Continued Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference to be held on 10/31/2019 at 01:30 PM 3420 Twelfth Street Courtroom 302 Riverside, CA 92501 for1 , (Potier, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by La Randa Ross
Wednesday, September 18, 2019
21 21 misc Proof of service Wed 09/18 4:19 PM
Proof of service Filed by Defendant Maxine Gilliam Related [+]. (Turoci, Todd)
Related: [-] 20 Stipulation By Maxine Gilliam and La Randa E. Ross to Dismiss the Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice
Thursday, September 12, 2019
20 20 3 pgs motion Stipulation (motion) Thu 09/12 3:33 PM
Stipulation By Maxine Gilliam and La Randa E. Ross to Dismiss the Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Filed by Defendant Maxine Gilliam (Turoci, Todd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2019
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 08/07 9:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/07/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)
Monday, August 05, 2019
18 18 2 pgs order Continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF) Mon 08/05 1:38 PM
Order Granting Request to continue/reschedule Pre-Trial hearing (BNC-PDF) Related [+] - It is Ordered that the Stipulation is approved and the pre-trial conference in this case is continued from August 22, 2019 at 1:30 pm to October 24, 2019 at 1:30 pm, in Courtroom 302. Signed on 8/5/2019 (Potier, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 17
court Hearing Continued (Other) Mon 08/05 12:41 PM
Hearing (Adv Other) Continued Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference to be held on 10/24/2019 at 01:30 PM 3420 Twelfth Street Courtroom 302 Riverside, CA 92501 for1 , (Potier, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by La Randa Ross
Thursday, August 01, 2019
17 17 5 pgs motion Stipulation (motion) Thu 08/01 9:15 AM
Stipulation By La Randa Ross and Maxine Laquanda Gilliam Filed by Plaintiff La Randa Ross (Halimi, George)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2019
16 16 3 pgs misc Voluntary Dismissal of Motion Wed 06/12 2:22 PM
Voluntary Dismissal of Motion Filed by Defendant Maxine Gilliam Related [+]. (Turoci, Todd)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney -- Notice of Motion and Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant; Declaration of Todd Turoci in Support Thereof (with Proof of Service)
15 15 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Wed 06/12 1:24 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect docket event was used to file this document. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT USING THE CORRECT DOCKET EVENT, i.e. BANKRUPTCY>BK-OTHER>VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF MOTION AND RELATE BACK TO THE ORIGINAL MOTION. NO ACTION TAKEN UNTIL CORRECTION IS MADE. Related [+] (Potier, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 14 Withdrawal re: filed by Defendant Maxine Gilliam
14 14 3 pgs misc Withdrawal re: Wed 06/12 9:28 AM
Withdrawal re: Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Filed by Defendant Maxine Gilliam Related [+]. (Turoci, Todd)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney -- Notice of Motion and Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant; Declaration of Todd Turoci in Support Thereof (with Proof of Service)
Tuesday, June 04, 2019
13 13 5 pgs motion Withdraw As Attorney (motion) Tue 06/04 11:53 AM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney -- Notice of Motion and Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant; Declaration of Todd Turoci in Support Thereof (with Proof of Service) Filed by Defendant Maxine Gilliam (Turoci, Todd)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2019
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 05/17 9:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/17/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, May 15, 2019
11 11 2 pgs order Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF) Wed 05/15 3:59 PM
Status Conference and Scheduling Order Pursuant to LBR 7016-1(a)(4) (BNC-PDF) Signed on 5/15/2019. Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/22/2019 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 302, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Scott H. Yun Pre-Trial Stipulation filed by 8/8/2019. Last day for Discovery to be completed, including receiving responses to discovery requests is 6/28/2019. (Mason, Shari)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2019
10 10 2 pgs court Hearing Set (Other) Fri 04/19 10:16 AM
Document/Hearing Held/Hearing Set PRE-TRIAL Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/22/2019 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 302, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Scott H. Yun (Potier, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff La Randa Ross
Wednesday, March 27, 2019
9 9 5 pgs misc Status report Wed 03/27 11:27 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff La Randa Ross Related [+]. (Halimi, George)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,4 Amended Complaint,6 Answer to Complaint
Tuesday, March 26, 2019
8 8 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Tue 03/26 4:43 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect hearing date was selected. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE AN AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION/HEARING WITH THE CORRECT HEARING INFORMATION. PLEASE RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE CORRECT HEARING INFORMATION. Related [+] (Potier, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 7 Status report filed by Plaintiff La Randa Ross
7 7 5 pgs misc Status report Tue 03/26 9:26 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff La Randa Ross Related [+]. (Halimi, George)
Related: [-] 4 Amended Complaint,6 Answer to Complaint
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
6 6 8 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/19 6:19 PM
Answer to Complaint and Proof of Service Filed by Maxine Gilliam. (Turoci, Todd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 07, 2019
5 5 1 pgs nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Thu 02/07 3:39 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Turoci, Todd. (Turoci, Todd)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 04, 2019
4 4 10 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 02/04 6:18 PM
Amended Complaint by George M Halimi on behalf of La Randa Ross against all defendants. Related [+]. (Halimi, George)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 6:19-ap-01014. Complaint by La Randa Ross against Maxine Gilliam. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet # 2 Summons) Nature of Suit: (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) filed by Plaintiff La Randa Ross
Monday, January 21, 2019
3 3 3 pgs cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 01/21 3:14 PM
Summons Service Executed on Maxine Gilliam 1/21/2019 (Halimi, George)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 18, 2019
2 2 4 pgs court Summons Issued Fri 01/18 1:16 PM
Summons Issued on Maxine Gilliam Date Issued 1/18/2019, Answer Due 2/19/2019 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 4/18/2019 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 302, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Scott H. Yun (Jeanmarie, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff La Randa Ross
Att: 1 Status conference procedures
Thursday, January 17, 2019
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/17 12:24 PM
Adversary case 6:19-ap-01014. Complaint by La Randa Ross against Maxine Gilliam. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (Halimi, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Summons