Police Jury of the Parish of Pointe Coupee, Louisiana v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45012 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 18, 2019 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:06 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Winn-Dixie Logistics, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amerisourcebergen Drug Coropration
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Indivior, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson and Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Police Jury of the Parish of Pointe Coupee, Louisiana
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Terminated: 02/15/2019
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:51 PM EDT |
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9102342. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:17-MD-2804 . Filed by Police Jury of the Parish of Pointe Coupee, Louisiana. (Lambert, Matthew) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |