City and County of San Francisco et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45022 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 13, 2020 |
Case in other court: | California Northern, 4:18-cv-07591 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:07 PM EST |
Defendant
Allergan USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Elizabeth LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Kadian LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis South Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Totowa LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Sales, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals plc
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. f/k/a Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo International plc
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Johnathan Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Richard Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Plaintiff
People of the State of California
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City and County of San Francisco
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/21/2020 7:00 AM EST |
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo International plc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Beverly Sackler, David A. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12937209.). Filed byThe People of the State of California acting by and through San Francisco City Attorney Dennis J. Herrera, City and County of San Francisco.(Herrera, Dennis) [Transferred from cand on 1/22/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by City and County of San Francisco, The People of the State of California acting by and through San Francisco City Attorney Dennis J. Herrera Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Herrera, Dennis) [Transferred from cand on 1/22/2019.] | |
3 | 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/2/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 1/22/2019.] | |
4 | 4 Proposed Summons. (Baig, Aelish) [Transferred from cand on 1/22/2019.] | |
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 2 pgs Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 1/22/2019.] | |
6 | 6 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo International plc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Beverly Sackler, David A. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 1/22/2019.] | |
Thursday, December 20, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Owen J. Clements Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Clements, Owen) [Transferred from cand on 1/22/2019.] | |
8 | 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaime Marie Huling Delaye Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Huling Delaye, Jaime) [Transferred from cand on 1/22/2019.] | |
9 | 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Yvonne Rosil Mere Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Mere, Yvonne) [Transferred from cand on 1/22/2019.] | |
Thursday, January 03, 2019 | ||
10 | 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/17/2019 . (ejkS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 1/22/2019.] | |
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
11 | 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by AmerisourceBergen Corporation.. (Johansen, Sarah) [Transferred from cand on 1/22/2019.] | |
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
12 | 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 1/22/2019.] | |
13 | 13 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by J Executive Committee on 1/14/19.(haS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 1/22/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
14 | 14 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/15/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 1/22/2019.] | |
15 | 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/15/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 1/22/2019.] | |
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
16 | 16 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for March 26, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by March 19, 2019. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:18-cv-07591-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 1/22/2019.] | |
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
17 | 17 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case transferred to the Northern District of Ohio. MDL Number 2804. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 1/22/2019.] | |
Tuesday, January 22, 2019 | ||
18 | 18 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern. Case number 4:18-cv-07591. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |