Riverside San Bernardino County Indian Health, Inc. v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45025 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2019 |
Case in other court: | California Central, 5:19-cv-00005 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:07 PM EST |
Defendant
Raymond Sackler Trust
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Stuart D. Baker
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPAINES, INC
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D. A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Thrifty Payless, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H. D. Smith Holding Company
|
|
Defendant
H. D. Smith Holdings, LLC
|
|
Defendant
H. D. Smith, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson and Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Miami-Luken Inc
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Riverside San Bernardino County Indian Health, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/15/2019 2:51 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 02, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 321 pgs COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22977242 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff RIVERSIDE-SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY INDIAN HEALTH, INC.. (Attorney Crystal Gayle Foley added to party RIVERSIDE-SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY INDIAN HEALTH, INC.(pty:pla))(Foley, Crystal) [Transferred from cacd on 1/23/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Foley, Crystal) [Transferred from cacd on 1/23/2019.] | |
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 1/23/2019.] | |
4 | 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 1/23/2019.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Paul J Hanly, Jr. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 1/23/2019.] | |
6 | 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Scott W. Williams. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 1/23/2019.] | |
7 | 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet should have been e-filed separately and in the correct event category. The event is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings. No further action is required unless the Court so directs. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 1/23/2019.] | |
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE - RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Riverside San Bernardino County Indian Health, Inc.. (Williams, Scott) [Transferred from cacd on 1/23/2019.] | |
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
9 | 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) [Transferred from cacd on 1/23/2019.] | |
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
10 | 10 Conditional Transfer Order - 75 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2804, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Ohio and assigned to Honorable Dan A. Polster. Case transferred electronically. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (twdb) [Transferred from cacd on 1/23/2019.] | |
Wednesday, January 23, 2019 | ||
11 | 11 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central. Case number 5:19-cv-00005. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |