New York Southern District Court
Judge:Ronnie Abrams
Case #: 1:19-cv-00657
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2019
Terminated:Oct 29, 2020
Last checked: Monday Jul 22, 2019 4:50 AM EDT
Defendant
AR Capital, LLC
Represented By
Cindy Schmitt Minniti
Reed Smith Llp (nyc)
contact info
Talia Nella Fiano
Reed Smith Llp (nyc)
contact info
Mark Stuart Goldstein
Reed Smith Llp (nyc)
contact info
Audra Jan Soloway
Paul Weiss (ny)
contact info
Defendant
ARC Advisory Services, LLC
Represented By
Cindy Schmitt Minniti
Reed Smith Llp (nyc)
contact info
Talia Nella Fiano
Reed Smith Llp (nyc)
contact info
Mark Stuart Goldstein
Reed Smith Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
American Realty Capital Advisors, LLC
Represented By
Cindy Schmitt Minniti
Reed Smith Llp (nyc)
contact info
Talia Nella Fiano
Reed Smith Llp (nyc)
contact info
Mark Stuart Goldstein
Reed Smith Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
American Realty Capital Healthcare Trust III Advisors, LLC
Represented By
Cindy Schmitt Minniti
Reed Smith Llp (nyc)
contact info
Talia Nella Fiano
Reed Smith Llp (nyc)
contact info
Mark Stuart Goldstein
Reed Smith Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
American Realty Capital II, LLC
Represented By
Cindy Schmitt Minniti
Reed Smith Llp (nyc)
contact info
Talia Nella Fiano
Reed Smith Llp (nyc)
contact info
Mark Stuart Goldstein
Reed Smith Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Bellevue Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By
Cindy Schmitt Minniti
Reed Smith Llp (nyc)
contact info
Talia Nella Fiano
Reed Smith Llp (nyc)
contact info
Mark Stuart Goldstein
Reed Smith Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Healthcare Trust Advisors, LLC
Represented By
Cindy Schmitt Minniti
Reed Smith Llp (nyc)
contact info
Talia Nella Fiano
Reed Smith Llp (nyc)
contact info
Mark Stuart Goldstein
Reed Smith Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
AR Global Investments, LLC
Represented By
Cindy Schmitt Minniti
Reed Smith Llp (nyc)
contact info
Talia Nella Fiano
Reed Smith Llp (nyc)
contact info
Mark Stuart Goldstein
Reed Smith Llp (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
W. Todd Jensen
Represented By
Andrew Ross Sack
Law Offices Of Scott A. Lucas
contact info
Scott Anthony Lucas
Law Office Scott A. Lucas, Esq.
contact info
Steven Mitchell Sack
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
50 50 order Memo Endorsement Wed 11/25 12:06 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:49 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal,,, filed by Bellevue Capital Partners, LLC, American Realty Capital II, LLC, Healthcare Trust Advisors, LLC, ARC Advisory Services, LLC, American Realty Capital Advisors, LLC, AR Global Investments, LLC, AR Capital, LLC, American Realty Capital Healthcare Trust III Advisors, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: If the parties seek to have the Court retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement, the terms of the agreement must be placed on the public record and "so ordered" by the Court within the same thirty-day period. See Hendrickson v. United States, 791 F.3d 354, 358 (2d Cir. 2015). (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/25/2020) (rro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 18, 2020
49 49 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 11/18 6:18 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) W. Todd Jensen pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Healthcare Trust Advisors, LLC, AR Capital, LLC, American Realty Capital Healthcare Trust III Advisors, LLC, American Realty Capital II, LLC, AR Global Investments, LLC, Bellevue Capital Partners, LLC, ARC Advisory Services, LLC, American Realty Capital Advisors, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Goldstein, Mark)
Related: [-]