Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Christy Criswell Wiegand
Case #: 2:19-cv-00069
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2019
Re-opened:Nov 07, 2024
Terminated:Mar 04, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Jul 21, 2019 4:46 AM EDT
Defendant
DENNY'S, INC.
Represented By
Darren W. Ford
Graydon Head & Ritchey LLP
contact info
Michael A. Roberts
Graydon Head & Ritchey LLP
contact info
Thomas A. Panighetti
Vorys, Sater, Seymour & Pease LLP
contact info
R. Kenneth Wellington
Graydon Head & Ritchey LLP
contact info
Defendant
DOE DEFENDANTS 1-10
Plaintiff
JULI WINTJEN
Represented By
Gary F. Lynch
Carlson Lynch, LLP
contact info
Gerald D. Wells, III
Connolly Wells & Gray, LLP
contact info
Edward W. Ciolko
Carlson Lynch, LLP
contact info
Matthew D. Brady
Carlson Lynch, LLP
contact info

GPO Feb 25 2021
OPINION re 54 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by JULI WINTJEN and 57 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, MOTION to Dismiss filed by DENNY'S, INC. Plaintiff's 54 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendant's 57 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Motion to Dismiss are DENIED in full. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 2/25/2021. (jmm)
GPO Nov 18 2021
OPINION. Plaintiff JULI WINTJEN's 89 Motion for Class Certification and 91 Motion for Conditional Certification will be GRANTED as more fully set forth in the attached opinion. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 11/18/2021. (jmm)
GPO Aug 25 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 171 Motion for Finding of Willfulness by JULI WINTJEN and 174 Motion to Exclude Opt-In Plaintiffs with Time-Barred Claims from Collective Action by DENNY'S, INC. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs' 171 Motion is DENIED IN FULL. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Defendant's 174 Motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as more fully set forth by said order. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 8/25/2022. (jmm)
GPO Jul 13 2023
OPINION. The Court will GRANT Plaintiff JULI WINTJEN's 226 Motion to Modify and finally certify the FLSA collective, and DENY Defendant DENNY'S, INC.'s 231 Motion seeking to decertify the Rule 23 class action as more fully stated in said opinion. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 7/13/2023. (jmm)
GPO Feb 22 2024
OPINION re 249 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Juli Wintjen and 252 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Denny's Inc. Plaintiff's 249 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Defendant's 252 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 2/22/2024. (bjw)
GPO Apr 04 2025
5. (bjw)OPINION re 332 Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses filed by Plaintiff Juli Wintjen. The 332 Motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as set forth more fully in the Opinion. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 4/4/202

Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
380 380 appeal USCA Notice of Docketing (Case Number & Case Manager Assigned) Mon 05/05 11:45 AM
USCA Case Number 25-1865 for378 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by JULI WINTJEN. USCA Case Manager Alicia (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (ca3amr)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
379 379 appeal USCA Notice of Docketing (Case Number & Case Manager Assigned) Fri 05/02 2:58 PM
USCA Case Number 25-1862 for374 Notice of Appeal, filed by DENNY'S, INC.. USCA Case Manager Alicia (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (gch3)
Related: [-]
378 378 appeal Notice of Cross Appeal (Credit Card Required) Fri 05/02 10:53 AM
NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to368 Order,, Terminate Motions, 339 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,369 Rule 58 Judgment,367 Memorandum Opinion, by JULI WINTJEN. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number APAWDC-8845500. Motion for IFP None. Representing Attorney: Jamisen A. Etzel. Court Reporter N/A. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. The Transcript Purchase Order form will not be mailed to the parties. The form is available on the Court's internet site. (Etzel, Jamisen)
Related: [-]
377 377 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 05/02 10:33 AM
Order granting375 Unopposed MOTION to Stay re 369 Rule 58 Judgment, by DENNY'S, INC.Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 5/2/2025. (bjw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
376 376 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 05/01 5:10 PM
BRIEF in Support re375 Motion to Stay filed by DENNY'S, INC.. (Ford, Darren)
Related: [-]
375 375 motion Stay Thu 05/01 5:09 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Stay re369 Rule 58 Judgment, by DENNY'S, INC.. (Ford, Darren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
374 374 appeal Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Required) Thu 05/01 3:15 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to369 Rule 58 Judgment, by DENNY'S, INC.. Filing fee $605, receipt number APAWDC-8844278. Motion for IFP N/A. Certificate of Appealability N/A. Court Reporter(s): N/A. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. The Transcript Purchase Order form will NOT be mailed to the parties. The form is available on the Court's internet site. (Ford, Darren)
Related: [-]