New Jersey District Court
Judge:Susan D Wigenton
Referred: Leda D Wettre
Case #: 2:19-cv-01026
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:44 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2019
Terminated:Dec 02, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 23, 2019 5:03 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
HUDSON EXPORTS, INC.
Represented By
EZRA SUTTON
Ezra Sutton PA
contact info
Counter Claimant
PRINCIPAL MANISH KESHWANI
Represented By
EZRA SUTTON
Ezra Sutton PA
contact info
Counter Defendant
HUDSON TRADING GROUP LLC
Represented By
SHERYL MINTZ GOSKI
Law Offices Of Sheryl Mintz Goski PA
contact info
Defendant
HUDSON EXPORTS, INC.
62 MAYFIELD AVENUE
EDISON, NJ 08837
Represented By
EZRA SUTTON
Ezra Sutton PA
contact info
Defendant
PRINCIPAL MANISH KESHWANI
62 MAYFIELD AVENUE
EDISON, NJ 08837
Represented By
EZRA SUTTON
Ezra Sutton PA
contact info
Plaintiff
HUDSON TRADING GROUP LLC
1237 PROPSECT STREEET SUITE K
LA JOLLA, CA 92037
Represented By
SHERYL MINTZ GOSKI
Law Offices Of Sheryl Mintz Goski PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, December 02, 2019
37 37 order Judgment Tue 12/03 11:20 AM
CONSENT JUDGMENT regarding Permanent Injunctions, etc.***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 12/2/2019. (ams, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2019
36 36 misc Letter Wed 11/27 6:17 AM
Letter from Sheryl Mintz Goski re 34 Order. (GOSKI, SHERYL)
Related: [-]
35 35 misc Letter Wed 11/27 6:16 AM
Letter from Sheryl Mintz Goski.(GOSKI, SHERYL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Judgment Fully Executed
Tuesday, November 12, 2019
34 34 order Order Tue 11/12 3:59 PM
TEXT ORDER - A Telephone Conference is set for 12/2/2019 at 10:30 am before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Once all parties are on the phone, please call Chambers at (973) 645-3574.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/12/2019. (kd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2019
minutes Status Conference Thu 11/07 4:05 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Telephone Conference held on 11/7/2019. (kd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2019
33 33 order Order Wed 10/23 9:02 AM
TEXT ORDER - Per counsel's request, the Telephone Conference set for 10/23/2019 is rescheduled to 11/7/2019 at 4:00 pm before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Once all parties are on the phone, please call Chambers at (973) 645-3574.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/23/2019. (kd)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2019
32 32 misc Letter Mon 10/21 4:00 PM
Letter from Sheryl Mintz Goski re 23 Order,. (GOSKI, SHERYL)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2019
31 31 misc Letter Fri 10/11 11:35 AM
Letter from Sheryl Mintz Goski re29 Order.(GOSKI, SHERYL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint
Friday, October 04, 2019
30 30 order Discovery Confidentiality Order Mon 10/07 10:58 AM
Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/4/2019. (byl)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2019
29 29 2 pgs order Order Mon 09/30 3:31 PM
ORDER Granting28 Plaintiff's Letter application for a two-week extension of time to file an Amended Complaint by consent, or file a motion for leave to file an Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/30/2019. (by)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2019
28 28 misc Letter Fri 09/27 11:57 AM
Letter from Sheryl Mintz Goski re27 Scheduling Order. (GOSKI, SHERYL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2019
27 27 order Scheduling Order Thu 08/01 2:33 PM
Letter Order: Defendants shall produce documents no later than August 30, 2019 and plaintiff's deadline to seek amendments to pleadings is extended to September 30, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 7/31/2019. (byl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2019
26 26 misc Letter Tue 07/30 6:31 PM
Letter from Sheryl Mintz Goski re18 Scheduling Order. (GOSKI, SHERYL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2019
25 25 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Thu 07/25 1:04 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Myron Greenspan to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (GOSKI, SHERYL)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Thu 07/25 1:03 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Robert B. Golden to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (GOSKI, SHERYL)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Order Thu 07/25 8:48 AM
TEXT ORDER - Per counsel's request, the Telephone Conference set for 10/22/2019 is rescheduled to 10/23/2019 at 3:00 pm before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Once all parties are on the phone, please call Chambers at (973) 645-3574.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 7/25/2019. (kd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2019
22 22 misc Letter Tue 07/23 9:35 AM
Letter from Sheryl Mintz Goski re 21 Order. (GOSKI, SHERYL)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order Tue 07/23 8:50 AM
TEXT ORDER - A Telephone Conference is set for 10/22/2019 at 3:00 pm before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Once all parties are on the phone, please call Chambers at (973) 645-3574.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 7/23/2019. (kd)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2019
minutes Status Conference Mon 07/22 3:49 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Telephone Conference held on 7/22/2019. (kd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2019
20 20 misc Letter Thu 07/18 3:47 PM
Letter from Myron Greenspan, Esq. re18 Scheduling Order. (GOSKI, SHERYL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2019
19 19 misc Letter Wed 07/17 3:28 PM
Letter from Ezra Sutton. (SUTTON, EZRA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2019
18 18 order Scheduling Order Fri 05/03 9:35 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/30/2019. (byl)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 04/30 12:22 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Scheduling Conference held on 4/30/2019. (kd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2019
17 17 discov Joint Discovery Plan Thu 04/25 3:44 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by HUDSON TRADING GROUP LLC.(GOSKI, SHERYL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, April 18, 2019
16 16 answer Answer to Counterclaim Thu 04/18 1:20 PM
Counterclaim Defendant Hudson Trading Group, LLC ANSWER to Counterclaim by HUDSON TRADING GROUP LLC.(GOSKI, SHERYL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2019
15 15 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 03/26 3:39 PM
LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference is set for 4/30/2019 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 3/26/2019. (kd)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2019
14 14 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/25 1:54 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by HUDSON EXPORTS, INC., MANISH KESHWANI identifying Hudson Exports, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (SUTTON, EZRA)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 03/25 1:51 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against HUDSON TRADING GROUP LLC by HUDSON EXPORTS, INC., MANISH KESHWANI.(SUTTON, EZRA)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/25 1:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by EZRA SUTTON on behalf of HUDSON EXPORTS, INC., MANISH KESHWANI (SUTTON, EZRA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Received Wed 02/27 3:54 PM
Pro Hac Vice fee of $300 received as to Myron Greenspan, Esq. and Robert B. Golden, Esq. Receipt number TRE100212 (in-jdb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 21, 2019
11 11 2 pgs order Order Thu 02/21 2:20 PM
CONSENT ORDER granting9 Plaintiff's Letter/Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of MYRON GREENSPAN, ESQ., and ROBERT B. GOLDEN, ESQ. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 2/21/2019. (dam, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 20, 2019
10 10 misc Letter Wed 02/20 12:55 PM
Letter from Sheryl Mintz Goski re9 Letter,.(GOSKI, SHERYL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Affidavit
Friday, February 15, 2019
9 9 misc Letter Fri 02/15 11:26 AM
Letter.(GOSKI, SHERYL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Certification Myron Greenspan, Esq.,
Att: 2 Declaration Certification Robert G. Golden, Esq.,
Att: 3 Declaration Certification Sheryl Mintz Goski, Esq.,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order Pro Hac Vice Admission
Friday, January 25, 2019
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/25 1:53 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by HUDSON TRADING GROUP LLC. (GOSKI, SHERYL)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Statement Fri 01/25 1:37 PM
STATEMENT Rule 7.1 by HUDSON TRADING GROUP LLC. (GOSKI, SHERYL)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc AO120 Patent/Trademark Form Fri 01/25 12:54 PM
AO120 Trademark Form filed. (dam, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 01/25 12:52 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to HUDSON EXPORTS, INC., MANISH KESHWANI. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, )
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 01/25 10:51 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HUDSON TRADING GROUP LLC. All Defendants. (GOSKI, SHERYL)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Lack of Disclosure Statement Fri 01/25 12:47 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (dam, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Fri 01/25 4:54 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Corporate Disclosure Statement D.E. 7 filed by Sheryl Goski on 1/25/2019 was submitted incorrectly as a Statement. The Disclosure Statement has been properly docketed D.E. 8. This filing is for informational purposes only. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (byl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 24, 2019
3 3 service Summons - Request for Issue Thu 01/24 2:03 PM
Request for Summons to be Issued by HUDSON TRADING GROUP LLC as to MANISH KESHWANI. (GOSKI, SHERYL)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons - Request for Issue Thu 01/24 2:02 PM
Request for Summons to be Issued by HUDSON TRADING GROUP LLC as to HUDSON EXPORTS, INC.. (GOSKI, SHERYL)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/24 1:59 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9331771) with JURY DEMAND, filed by HUDSON TRADING GROUP LLC.(GOSKI, SHERYL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 01/24 3:34 PM
Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (eu, )
Related: [-]