Puerto Rican Parade Committee of Chicago, Inc. v. Martinez
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-03480
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-03480
Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Carol A Doyle |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-00030 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property 11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 24, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Carmen Martinez
2733 W Division St
Chicago, IL 60622 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Puerto Rican Parade Committee of Chicago, Inc.
1237 North California
Chicago, IL 60622 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 1:06 PM CDT |
Tuesday, March 24, 2020 | ||
49 | 49
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 03/24 3:02 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-30 Closed . (Green, Ron) |
|
48 | 48
court
Hearing Stricken (Other)
Tue 03/24 2:47 PM
Hearing Scheduled for March 26, 2020 is Stricken . (Castaneda, Peter) |
|
47 | 47
order
Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Tue 03/24 2:47 PM
Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding . Signed on 3/24/2020 (Green, Ron) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
46 | 46
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Thu 03/05 2:32 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 03/26/2020 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 03/05/2020. (Castaneda, Peter) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
45 | 45
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Thu 02/27 11:29 AM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 03/05/2020 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 02/27/2020. (Castaneda, Peter) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
44 | 44
order
Stipulation and Order
Wed 02/26 1:52 PM
Agreed Stipulation and Order. Signed on 2/26/2020 (Green, Ron) |
|
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
43 | 43
misc
Proposed Order
Fri 02/21 11:41 AM
Proposed Order - Agreed Order Filed by Paul M. Bach on behalf of Puerto Rican Parade Committee of Chicago, Inc. . (Bach, Paul) |
|
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
42 | 42
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Thu 01/23 2:33 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 02/27/2020 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 01/23/2020. (Castaneda, Peter) |
|
Thursday, December 19, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Thu 12/19 3:12 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 01/23/2020 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 12/19/2019. (Castaneda, Peter) |
|
Wednesday, December 11, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Wed 12/11 8:30 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 12/19/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 12/11/2019. (Castaneda, Peter) |
|
Wednesday, November 13, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
order
Extend Time
Thu 11/14 8:48 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time . Discovery Cutoff 12/10/2019. Signed on 11/13/2019. (Rodarte, Aida) |
|
Tuesday, November 12, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Proposed Order
Tue 11/12 9:16 AM
Proposed Order - Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines Filed by William S Hackney III on behalf of Carmen Martinez . (Hackney, William) |
|
Wednesday, November 06, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Wed 11/06 12:01 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 12/11/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 11/06/2019. (Castaneda, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, November 05, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
notice
2-Notice of Motion
Tue 11/05 2:00 PM
Notice of Motion Filed by William S Hackney III on behalf of Carmen Martinez . Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2019 at 10:00 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 742, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Hackney, William) |
|
35 | 35
motion
Extend Time
Tue 11/05 1:59 PM
Notice of Motion and Agreed Motion to Extend Time extend discovery deadlines Filed by William S Hackney III on behalf of Carmen Martinez. Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2019 at 10:00 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 742, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Hackney, William) |
|
Wednesday, September 04, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
court
Hearing Stricken (Motion)
Wed 09/04 11:42 AM
Hearing Scheduled for September 5, 2019 is Stricken . (Castaneda, Peter) |
|
33 | 33
order
Extend Time
Wed 09/04 11:41 AM
Order Setting Discovery Deadlines . Written Discovery must be completed by 10/04/2019. All Discovery must be completed by 11/05/2019. Signed on 9/4/2019. (Rodarte, Aida) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
utility
U - Corrective Entry Hearing Rescheduled
Fri 08/23 12:01 PM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Hearing Rescheduled . Hearing scheduled for 9/5/2019 at 10:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 742, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Sullivan, Elizabeth) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Extend Time
Wed 08/21 6:11 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Extend Time to Complete Written Discovery and Issue Subpeonas Filed by Paul M. Bach on behalf of Puerto Rican Parade Committee of Chicago, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 9/4/2019 at 10:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 742, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Bach, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 09, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Thu 05/09 2:01 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 05/09/2019. (Castaneda, Peter) |
|
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
notice
4-Notice of Filing
Mon 05/06 2:47 PM
Notice of Filing Filed by William S Hackney III on behalf of Carmen Martinez . (Hackney, William) |
|
28 | 28
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 05/06 2:46 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by William S Hackney III on behalf of Carmen Martinez. (Hackney, William) |
|
27 | 27
notice
4-Notice of Filing
Mon 05/06 2:39 PM
Notice of Filing Filed by William S Hackney III on behalf of Carmen Martinez . (Hackney, William) |
|
26 | 26
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 05/06 2:38 PM
Answer to Amended Complaint Filed by William S Hackney III on behalf of Carmen Martinez. (Hackney, William) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
order
Extend Time
Fri 04/26 9:16 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time . Answer due by: 5/6/2019. Signed on 4/25/2019. (Shabez, Cindy) |
|
24 | 24
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Thu 04/25 3:06 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 05/09/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 04/25/2019. (Utter, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Proposed Order
Wed 04/24 3:56 PM
Proposed Order - Extension of Time Filed by William S Hackney III on behalf of Carmen Martinez . (Hackney, William) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
notice
2-Notice of Motion
Tue 04/16 10:57 AM
Notice of Motion Filed by William S Hackney III on behalf of Carmen Martinez . Hearing scheduled for 4/25/2019 at 10:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 742, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Hackney, William) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Extend Time
Mon 04/15 2:57 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Extend Time Answer or Otherwise Plead to Complaint Filed by William S Hackney III on behalf of Carmen Martinez. Hearing scheduled for 4/25/2019 at 10:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 742, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Hackney, William) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
order
Extend Time
Fri 03/29 9:34 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time . Amended Complaint Deadline 3/12/2019. Signed on 3/28/2019. (Rodarte, Aida) |
|
19 | 19
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 03/29 9:32 AM
(E)Order Mooting Motion to Dismiss Adversary . Signed on 3/28/2019. (Rodarte, Aida) |
|
18 | 18
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Thu 03/28 4:27 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 04/25/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 03/28/2019. (Nelson, Freddie) |
|
17 | 17
order
Intervene
Thu 03/28 4:27 PM
(E)Order Granting Motion To Intervene . Signed on 03/28/2019. (Nelson, Freddie) |
|
16 | 16
order
Extend Time
Thu 03/28 3:27 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time . Answer due by: 4/15/2019. Signed on 3/28/2019. (Brown, Venita) |
|
15 | 15
notice
4-Notice of Filing
Thu 03/28 2:17 PM
Notice of Filing Attorney Generals Intervenors Complaint Filed by Kristin C Louis on behalf of Illinois Attorney General. (Louis, Kristin) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Appearance
Thu 03/28 2:02 PM
Appearance Filed by Barry Goldberg on behalf of Illinois Attorney General. (Goldberg, Barry) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Appearance
Thu 03/28 1:53 PM
Appearance Filed by Kristin C Louis on behalf of Illinois Attorney General. (Louis, Kristin) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Proposed Order
Thu 03/28 11:53 AM
Proposed Order - Order Granting Agreed Motion to Extend Extend Time Filed by Matthew A Flamm on behalf of Carmen Martinez . (Flamm, Matthew) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extend Time
Mon 03/25 3:51 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Extend Time respond to amended complaint Filed by Matthew A Flamm on behalf of Carmen Martinez. Hearing scheduled for 3/28/2019 at 10:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 742, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Flamm, Matthew) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Intervene
Fri 03/22 3:21 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Intervene Adversary Complaint against Carmen Martinez Filed by Kristin C Louis on behalf of Illinois Attorney General. Hearing scheduled for 3/28/2019 at 10:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 742, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Louis, Kristin) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Complaint Intervenors Proposed Complaint | ||
Att: 2 AG Appearances | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 13, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 03/13 4:11 PM
Amended Complaint by Paul M Bach on behalf of Puerto Rican Parade Committee of Chicago, Inc. against Carmen Martinez. . (Bach, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Claim Part 1 | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Claim Part 2 | ||
Att: 3 Bankruptcy Docket 82-2 | ||
Att: 4 Bankruptcy Docket 82-3 | ||
Att: 5 Bankruptcy Docket 82-4 | ||
Tuesday, March 12, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extend Time
Tue 03/12 6:30 PM
Notice of Motion and Agreed Motion to Extend Time to File Amended Complaint by One Day Filed by Paul M Bach on behalf of Puerto Rican Parade Committee of Chicago, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 3/28/2019 at 10:00 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 742, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Bach, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Scheduling
Fri 03/01 6:56 AM
Order Scheduling . Amendment Complaint due by 3/12/2019. Answer due by: 3/26/2019. Status/Ruling Set for 3/28/2019 at 10:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 742, Chicago, Illinois 60604. Signed on 2/28/2019 (Mendoza, Catherine) |
|
6 | 6
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Thu 02/28 12:55 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 03/28/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 02/28/2019. (Castaneda, Peter) |
|
5 | 5
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Thu 02/28 12:54 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . hearing scheduled for 03/28/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 02/28/2019. (Castaneda, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 02/26 12:49 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Matthew A Flamm on behalf of Carmen Martinez. Hearing scheduled for 2/28/2019 at 10:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 742, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Flamm, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 | ||
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Form 1040)
Fri 01/25 10:19 AM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Filed by Paul M Bach on behalf of Puerto Rican Parade Committee of Chicago, Inc. . (Bach, Paul) |
|
Wednesday, January 23, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Wed 01/23 4:19 PM
Summons Issued on Carmen Martinez Answer Due 02/22/2019 (Admin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/23 4:19 PM
Adversary case 19-00030 (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)), (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)), (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))): Complaint by Puerto Rican Parade Committee of Chicago, Inc. against Carmen Martinez. (Fee Not Required). Status hearing to be held on 2/28/2019 at 10:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 742, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Bach, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Claim of Carmen Martinez (5-1) | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Claim Part Two of Carmen Martinez (5-1) | ||
Att: 3 Bankruptcy Docket 82-2 | ||
Att: 4 Bankruptcy Docket 82-3 | ||
Att: 5 Bankruptcy Docket 82-4 |