Xclusive-Lee, Inc. v. Hadid
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Pamela K Chen |
Referred: | Cheryl L Pollak |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-00520 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jan 28, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 19, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 27, 2019 4:26 AM EDT |
Defendant
Jelena Noura Hadid
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Xclusive-Lee, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
1. | Gigi Hadid wants judge to toss lawsuit over paparazzi photo (pagesix.com) |
Submitted Tue 04/02/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 22, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Report on Copyright AO121
Mon 07/22 9:47 AM
Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Hong, Loan) |
|
Att: 1 Judgment | ||
Friday, July 19, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
order
Judgment - Clerk
Fri 07/19 1:34 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT- A Memorandum and Order of the Honorable Pamela K. Chen, United States District Judge, having been filed on July 18, 2019, granting Defendants motion to dismiss in its entirety; it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the Defendants motion to dismiss is granted in its entirety; and that this case is closed. Signed by Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court by Deputy Clerk Jalitza Poveda on 7/19/2019. (Love, Alexis) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
8
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 07/18 10:42 AM
ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached, the Court grants Defendant's motion to dismiss in its entirety. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment and terminate this action. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 7/18/2019. (Nadig, Alok) |
|
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
13
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Opposition
Fri 06/07 2:19 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re15 Memorandum in Support filed by Xclusive-Lee, Inc.. |
|
Thursday, June 06, 2019 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 06/06 10:21 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff has failed to file its opposition brief by the June 5, 2019 deadline set forth in the Court's April 10, 2019 scheduling order. The Court directs Plaintiff to do so by June 7, 2019 . Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 6/6/2019. (Nadig, Alok) |
||
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
16
pgs
respoth
Reply in Support
Wed 06/05 3:26 PM
REPLY in Support re14 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jelena Noura Hadid. (Quinn, John) |
|
15 | 15
20
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Wed 06/05 3:25 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re14 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jelena Noura Hadid. (Quinn, John) |
|
14 | 14
1
pgs
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 06/05 3:22 PM
Notice of MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jelena Noura Hadid. (Quinn, John) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Thu 05/23 7:21 PM
Letter Providing Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss on Defendant on May 22, 2019 by Xclusive-Lee, Inc. |
|
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 05/23 10:04 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff has failed to file a copy of a cover letter confirming service of its opposition brief by the deadline set forth in the Court's April 10, 2019 scheduling order. Plaintiff shall do so by May 29, 2019 . To the extent Plaintiff has not yet served its opposition brief, the Court extends the deadline for Plaintiff to do so until May 29, 2019. The June 5, 2019 deadline for Defendant to serve and file her reply remains in effect. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 5/23/2019. (Nadig, Alok) |
||
Wednesday, May 01, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Letter
Wed 05/01 6:45 PM
Letter re: Service of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Jelena Noura Hadid (Quinn, John) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
Wed 04/10 1:00 PM
ORDER: The Court denies8 Defendant's request for a pre-motion conference as unnecessary and sets the following briefing schedule: (1) Defendant shall serve her motion to dismiss and accompanying memorandum of law by May 1, 2019 ; (2) Plaintiff shall serve its opposition brief by May 22, 2019 ; and (3) Defendant may serve and file her reply, if any, by June 5, 2019 . As a courtesy to the Court, the parties are encouraged to not file their motion papers until the motion is fully briefed. If the parties follow this practice, the motion and all memoranda of law are to be served on the other party along with a cover letter setting forth whom the attorney represents and the papers being served. The parties should electronically file only a copy of the cover letter as a letter, not as a motion. On the day the motion is fully briefed, in this case June 5, 2019 , each party should electronically file its motion papers. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 4/10/2019. (Nadig, Alok) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Mon 04/08 11:59 PM
Letter in Response to Defendant's Request for Pre-Motion Conference by Xclusive-Lee, Inc. |
|
Friday, April 05, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/05 10:26 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Talia Nissimyan on behalf of Jelena Noura Hadid (aty to be noticed) (Nissimyan, Talia) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/04 1:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Craig on behalf of Jelena Noura Hadid (aty to be noticed) (Craig, Matthew) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
4
pgs
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Mon 04/01 4:29 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re: anticipated motion to dismiss by Jelena Noura Hadid. (Quinn, John) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/01 3:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Charles Quinn on behalf of Jelena Noura Hadid (aty to be noticed) (Quinn, John) |
|
Friday, February 01, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 02/01 1:40 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Xclusive-Lee, Inc.. Jelena Noura Hadid waiver sent on 1/31/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. |
|
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Report on Copyright AO121
Wed 01/30 11:18 AM
Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Hong, Loan) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 01/30 11:02 AM
Summons Issued as to Jelena Noura "Gig Hadid. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Wed 01/30 11:00 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Wed 01/30 10:59 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 01/30 10:59 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
30+
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 01/28 9:49 AM
COMPLAINT against Jelena Noura "Gig Hadid filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11140410 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Xclusive-Lee, Inc.. |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |