City of Thornton v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45034 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 28, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Colorado, 1:19-cv-00112 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:08 PM EST |
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
|
|
Defendant
John and Jane Does 1-100
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt, LLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Thornton
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Smith Drug Company
Terminated: 10/01/2019
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:58 PM EDT |
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., John and Jane Does 1-100, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt PLC, Mallinckrodt, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The, Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., SpecGX LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6480996)Attorney Derek William Loeser added to party City of Thornton(pty:pla), filed by City of Thornton.(Loeser, Derek) [Transferred from cod on 1/28/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Related Cases by Plaintiff City of Thornton (Loeser, Derek) [Transferred from cod on 1/28/2019.] | |
3 | 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re:1 Complaint, and2 Notice of Related Cases filed by attorney Stephen C. Peters. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (rvill, ) [Transferred from cod on 1/28/2019.] | |
4 | 4 Case assigned to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) [Transferred from cod on 1/28/2019.] | |
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Summons submitted are incomplete and will not be issued. All defendants must be listed on the caption. (rvill, ) [Transferred from cod on 1/28/2019.] | |
6 | 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang: IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and FED. R. CIV. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to: (1)Convene a scheduling conference under FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling Order, and resolve discovery matters; (2)ADR: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. Early Neutral Evaluation is approved. On the informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in a settlement conference conducted by the magistrate judge if the parties have engaged in an Early Neutral Evaluation and are unable to afford or otherwise attain private settlement assistance; (3)Hear and determine referred matters in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B). by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/14/19. Text Only Entry (msklc2, ) [Transferred from cod on 1/28/2019.] | |
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
7 | 7 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and depositions from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/15/19. Text Only Entry (pglov) [Transferred from cod on 1/28/2019.] | |
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-76) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado, 19-cv-00112 MSK-NYW, to the Northern District of Ohio, to become part of MDL 2804, by Clerk on 1/25/2019. (evana, ) [Transferred from cod on 1/28/2019.] | |
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
9 | 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Colorado. Case number 1:19-cv-00112. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |