Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45035 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 28, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Colorado, 1:19-cv-00113 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:08 PM EST |
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS RX Services, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
John and Jane Does 1-100
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt, LLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Omnicare Distribution Center LLC
|
|
Defendant
Omnicare, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Smith Drug Company
Terminated: 10/01/2019
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:51 PM EDT |
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., John and Jane Does 1-100, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt PLC, Mallinckrodt, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., SpecGX LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6481023)Attorney Derek William Loeser added to party The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson(pty:pla), filed by The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson.(Loeser, Derek) [Transferred from cod on 1/28/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Related Cases by Plaintiff The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson (Loeser, Derek) [Transferred from cod on 1/28/2019.] | |
3 | 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re:1 Complaint, and2 Notice of Related Cases filed by attorney Stephen C. Peters. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (rvill, ) [Transferred from cod on 1/28/2019.] | |
4 | 4 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) [Transferred from cod on 1/28/2019.] | |
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Summons submitted are incomplete and will not be issued. All defendants must be listed on the caption. (rvill, ) [Transferred from cod on 1/28/2019.] | |
6 | 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/14/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) [Transferred from cod on 1/28/2019.] | |
7 | 7 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/14/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) [Transferred from cod on 1/28/2019.] | |
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-76) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado, 19-cv-00113 RM-NYW, to the Northern District of Ohio, to become part of MDL 2804, by Clerk on 1/25/2019. (evana, ) [Transferred from cod on 1/28/2019.] | |
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
9 | 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Colorado. Case number 1:19-cv-00113. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |