Sobel Westex, Inc. dba Baltic Linen v. ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:19-bk-80064
Lead BK case is: 8:19-bk-80064
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:19-ap-08002 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jan 28, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 06, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC
700 Pilgrim Way
Green Bay, WI 54304 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sobel Westex, Inc. dba Baltic Linen
2670 S. Western Avenue
Las Vegas, NV 89109 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 02/06 3:21 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff Sobel Westex, Inc. d/b/a Baltic Linen . The motion is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed without prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (dkk) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 02/06 8:40 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Sobel Westex, Inc. dba Baltic Linen (Turner, Patrick) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Wed 02/06 3:36 PM
Disposition of Adversary Sobel Westex, Inc. dba Baltic Linen v. ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC CASE DISMISSED on 2/6/19 . (nmw) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 02/06 3:37 PM
Adversary Case Closed Sobel Westex, Inc. dba Baltic Linen v. ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC CASE DISMISSED on 2/6/19 . (nmw) |
||
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Mon 01/28 9:48 AM
Summons Issued on ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC Date Issued 1/28/2019, Answer Due 2/27/2019 . (nmw) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Statement of Corporate Ownership
Mon 01/28 9:41 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Patrick Raymond Turner on behalf of Sobel Westex, Inc. dba Baltic Linen. (Turner, Patrick) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 01/28 9:40 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 19-08002 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7787723, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 01/28 9:36 AM
Adversary case 19-08002 Complaint by Sobel Westex, Inc. dba Baltic Linen against ShopKo Stores Operating Co., LLC. NOS: 91 (Declaratory judgment). Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Patrick Raymond Turner on behalf of Sobel Westex, Inc. dba Baltic Linen. Nature of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other))(Turner, Patrick) ROTATION CORRECTED. Modified on 1/28/2019 (nmw) |