California Central District Court
Judge:Stephen V Wilson
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 2:19-cv-00651
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Jan 28, 2019
Terminated:Mar 21, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Jul 27, 2019 1:14 AM PDT
Consol Plaintiff
William Guy
Represented By
Laurence M Rosen
Rosen Law Firm PA
contact info
Defendant
Maria Rigatti
Represented By
Lauren Claire Barnett
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John Michael Gildersleeve
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John W Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
William James Scillaci
Represented By
Lauren Claire Barnett
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John Michael Gildersleeve
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John W Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Brett White
Represented By
Lauren Claire Barnett
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John Michael Gildersleeve
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John W Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Peter J. Taylor
Represented By
Lauren Claire Barnett
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John Michael Gildersleeve
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John W Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ellen O. Tauscher
Represented By
Lauren Claire Barnett
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John Michael Gildersleeve
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John W Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
William P. Sullivan
Represented By
Lauren Claire Barnett
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John Michael Gildersleeve
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John W Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Linda G. Stuntz
Represented By
Lauren Claire Barnett
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John Michael Gildersleeve
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John W Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Southern California Edison
Represented By
Lauren Claire Barnett
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John Michael Gildersleeve
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John W Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Richard T. Schlosberg III
Represented By
Lauren Claire Barnett
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John Michael Gildersleeve
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John W Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jagjeet S. Bindra
Represented By
Lauren Claire Barnett
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John Michael Gildersleeve
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John W Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pedro J. Pizarro
Represented By
Lauren Claire Barnett
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John Michael Gildersleeve
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John W Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
William M. Petmecky III
Represented By
Lauren Claire Barnett
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John Michael Gildersleeve
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John W Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kevin M. Payne
Represented By
Lauren Claire Barnett
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John Michael Gildersleeve
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John W Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Timothy O'Toole
Represented By
Lauren Claire Barnett
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John Michael Gildersleeve
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John W Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
James T. Morris
Represented By
Lauren Claire Barnett
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John Michael Gildersleeve
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John W Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ron Litzinger
Represented By
Lauren Claire Barnett
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John Michael Gildersleeve
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John W Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Louis Hernandez, Jr.
Represented By
Lauren Claire Barnett
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John Michael Gildersleeve
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John W Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Edison International
Represented By
Lauren Claire Barnett
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John Michael Gildersleeve
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John W Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Theodore F. Craver, Jr.
Represented By
Lauren Claire Barnett
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John Michael Gildersleeve
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John W Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Vanessa C.L. Chang
Represented By
Lauren Claire Barnett
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John Michael Gildersleeve
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John W Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Michael C. Camunez
Represented By
Lauren Claire Barnett
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John Michael Gildersleeve
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
John W Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Stan Kieffer
Represented By
Laurence M Rosen
Rosen Law Firm PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
49 49 order Dismissing Case Wed 02/14 4:46 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 23.1 AND 41 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. This action is dismissed without prejudice as to Plaintiffs, Nominal Defendants, and/or any other shareholder of Nominal Defendants. 2. The Parties shall bear their own fees and costs in connection with the action. RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case,48 . (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
48 48 stip Dismiss Case Fri 02/09 2:46 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 23.1 and 41 filed by Defendants Jagjeet S. Bindra, Michael C. Camunez, Vanessa C.L. Chang, Theodore F. Craver, Jr., Edison International, Louis Hernandez, Jr., Ron Litzinger, James T. Morris, Timothy O'Toole, Kevin M. Payne, William M. Petmecky III, Pedro J. Pizarro, Maria Rigatti, Richard T. Schlosberg III, William James Scillaci, Southern California Edison, Linda G. Stuntz, William P. Sullivan, Ellen O. Tauscher, Peter J. Taylor, Brett White.(Barnett, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 26, 2024
47 47 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 01/26 8:52 AM
IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: Status Report46 : The proposal to submit another status report no later than February 9, 2024 is APPROVED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
46 46 misc Status Report Fri 01/19 1:29 PM
STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Jagjeet S. Bindra, Michael C. Camunez, Vanessa C.L. Chang, Theodore F. Craver, Jr., Edison International, Louis Hernandez, Jr., Ron Litzinger, James T. Morris, Timothy O'Toole, Kevin M. Payne, William M. Petmecky III, Pedro J. Pizarro, Maria Rigatti, Richard T. Schlosberg III, William James Scillaci, Southern California Edison, Linda G. Stuntz, William P. Sullivan, Ellen O. Tauscher, Peter J. Taylor, Brett White. (Gildersleeve, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
45 45 misc Status Report Fri 12/22 12:37 PM
STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Jagjeet S. Bindra, Michael C. Camunez, Vanessa C.L. Chang, Theodore F. Craver, Jr., Edison International, Louis Hernandez, Jr., Ron Litzinger, James T. Morris, Timothy O'Toole, Kevin M. Payne, William M. Petmecky III, Pedro J. Pizarro, Maria Rigatti, Richard T. Schlosberg III, William James Scillaci, Southern California Edison, Linda G. Stuntz, William P. Sullivan, Ellen O. Tauscher, Peter J. Taylor, Brett White. (Gildersleeve, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
44 44 misc Status Report Thu 06/22 8:48 AM
STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Jagjeet S. Bindra, Michael C. Camunez, Vanessa C.L. Chang, Theodore F. Craver, Jr., Edison International, Louis Hernandez, Jr., Ron Litzinger, James T. Morris, Timothy O'Toole, Kevin M. Payne, William M. Petmecky III, Pedro J. Pizarro, Maria Rigatti, Richard T. Schlosberg III, William James Scillaci, Southern California Edison, Linda G. Stuntz, William P. Sullivan, Ellen O. Tauscher, Peter J. Taylor, Brett White. (Barnett, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2022
43 43 misc Status Report Thu 12/22 12:13 PM
STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Jagjeet S. Bindra, Michael C. Camunez, Vanessa C.L. Chang, Theodore F. Craver, Jr., Edison International, Louis Hernandez, Jr., Ron Litzinger, James T. Morris, Timothy O'Toole, Kevin M. Payne, William M. Petmecky III, Pedro J. Pizarro, Maria Rigatti, Richard T. Schlosberg III, William James Scillaci, Southern California Edison, Linda G. Stuntz, William P. Sullivan, Ellen O. Tauscher, Peter J. Taylor, Brett White. (Gildersleeve, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2022
42 42 misc Status Report Thu 06/23 5:18 PM
STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Jagjeet S. Bindra, Michael C. Camunez, Vanessa C.L. Chang, Theodore F. Craver, Jr., Edison International, Louis Hernandez, Jr., Ron Litzinger, James T. Morris, Timothy O'Toole, Kevin M. Payne, William M. Petmecky III, Pedro J. Pizarro, Maria Rigatti, Richard T. Schlosberg III, William James Scillaci, Southern California Edison, Linda G. Stuntz, William P. Sullivan, Ellen O. Tauscher, Peter J. Taylor, Brett White. (Gildersleeve, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 23, 2021
41 41 misc Status Report Thu 12/23 2:59 PM
STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Jagjeet S. Bindra, Michael C. Camunez, Vanessa C.L. Chang, Theodore F. Craver, Jr., Edison International, Louis Hernandez, Jr., Ron Litzinger, James T. Morris, Timothy O'Toole, Kevin M. Payne, William M. Petmecky III, Pedro J. Pizarro, Maria Rigatti, Richard T. Schlosberg III, William James Scillaci, Southern California Edison, Linda G. Stuntz, William P. Sullivan, Ellen O. Tauscher, Peter J. Taylor, Brett White. (Gildersleeve, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 24, 2021
40 40 1 pgs order Order Thu 06/24 4:12 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING STAY OF ACTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, re Stipulation to Stay Case,39 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. This action shall remain stayed in light of other pending litigation relating to the Southern California wildfires; 2. All other terms of the Court's March 21, 2019 Order shall continue to apply to the stay; and 3. The parties shall submit to the Court joint status reports every six months from the date of the Court's Order on this stipulation. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 07, 2021
39 39 stip Stay Case Mon 06/07 6:39 PM
STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Related Litigation filed by Defendants Jagjeet S. Bindra, Michael C. Camunez, Vanessa C.L. Chang, Theodore F. Craver, Jr., Edison International, Louis Hernandez, Jr., Ron Litzinger, James T. Morris, Timothy O'Toole, Kevin M. Payne, William M. Petmecky III, Pedro J. Pizarro, Maria Rigatti, Richard T. Schlosberg III, William James Scillaci, Southern California Edison, Linda G. Stuntz, William P. Sullivan, Ellen O. Tauscher, Peter J. Taylor, Brett White.(Gildersleeve, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, March 21, 2019
38 38 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Thu 03/21 5:05 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION37 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: This action shall be stayed until entry of an order denying (in whole or in part) or granting with prejudice a motion to dismiss the action captioned Barnes v. Edison International et al., No. 2:18-cv-09690-CBM (C.D. Cal.) ("Wildfire Securities Action"). Any party to this action shall have the right to lift the stay upon providing 30 days' prior written notice to all other parties via their counsel of record. During the pendency of the stay, Plaintiffs may file an amended consolidated complaint, although Defendants need not answer, move or otherwise respond to any such amended consolidated complaint. See document for specifics. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
37 37 stip Stay Case Wed 03/13 9:22 PM
STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Securities Action filed by Defendants Jagjeet S. Bindra, Michael C. Camunez, Vanessa C.L. Chang, Theodore F. Craver, Jr., Edison International, Louis Hernandez, Jr., Ron Litzinger, James T. Morris, Timothy O'Toole, Kevin M. Payne, William M. Petmecky III, Pedro J. Pizarro, Maria Rigatti, Richard T. Schlosberg III, William James Scillaci, Southern California Edison, Linda G. Stuntz, William P. Sullivan, Ellen O. Tauscher, Peter J. Taylor, Brett White.(Gildersleeve, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 04, 2019
36 36 notice Appearance Mon 03/04 4:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Lauren Claire Barnett on behalf of Defendants Jagjeet S. Bindra, Michael C. Camunez, Vanessa C.L. Chang, Theodore F. Craver, Jr., Edison International, Louis Hernandez, Jr., Ron Litzinger, James T. Morris, Timothy O'Toole, Kevin M. Payne, William M. Petmecky III, Pedro J. Pizarro, Maria Rigatti, Richard T. Schlosberg III, William James Scillaci, Southern California Edison, Linda G. Stuntz, William P. Sullivan, Ellen O. Tauscher, Peter J. Taylor, Brett White (Attorney Lauren Claire Barnett added to party Jagjeet S. Bindra(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Claire Barnett added to party Michael C. Camunez(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Claire Barnett added to party Vanessa C.L. Chang(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Claire Barnett added to party Theodore F. Craver, Jr.(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Claire Barnett added to party Edison International (pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Claire Barnett added to party Louis Hernandez, Jr.(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Claire Barnett added to party Ron Litzinger(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Claire Barnett added to party James T. Morris(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Claire Barnett added to party Timothy O'Toole(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Claire Barnett added to party Kevin M. Payne(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Claire Barnett added to party William M. Petmecky III(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Claire Barnett added to party Pedro J. Pizarro(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Claire Barnett added to party Maria Rigatti(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Claire Barnett added to party Richard T. Schlosberg III(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Claire Barnett added to party William James Scillaci(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Claire Barnett added to party Southern California Edison (pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Claire Barnett added to party Linda G. Stuntz(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Claire Barnett added to party William P. Sullivan(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Claire Barnett added to party Ellen O. Tauscher(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Claire Barnett added to party Peter J. Taylor(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Claire Barnett added to party Brett White(pty:dft))(Barnett, Lauren)
Related: [-]
35 35 notice Appearance Mon 03/04 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney John Michael Gildersleeve on behalf of Defendants Jagjeet S. Bindra, Michael C. Camunez, Vanessa C.L. Chang, Theodore F. Craver, Jr., Edison International, Louis Hernandez, Jr., Ron Litzinger, James T. Morris, Timothy O'Toole, Kevin M. Payne, William M. Petmecky III, Pedro J. Pizarro, Maria Rigatti, Richard T. Schlosberg III, William James Scillaci, Southern California Edison, Linda G. Stuntz, William P. Sullivan, Ellen O. Tauscher, Peter J. Taylor, Brett White (Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party Jagjeet S. Bindra(pty:dft), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party Michael C. Camunez(pty:dft), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party Vanessa C.L. Chang(pty:dft), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party Theodore F. Craver, Jr.(pty:dft), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party Edison International (pty:dft), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party Louis Hernandez, Jr.(pty:dft), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party Ron Litzinger(pty:dft), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party James T. Morris(pty:dft), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party Timothy O'Toole(pty:dft), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party Kevin M. Payne(pty:dft), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party William M. Petmecky III(pty:dft), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party Pedro J. Pizarro(pty:dft), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party Maria Rigatti(pty:dft), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party Richard T. Schlosberg III(pty:dft), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party William James Scillaci(pty:dft), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party Southern California Edison (pty:dft), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party Linda G. Stuntz(pty:dft), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party William P. Sullivan(pty:dft), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party Ellen O. Tauscher(pty:dft), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party Peter J. Taylor(pty:dft), Attorney John Michael Gildersleeve added to party Brett White(pty:dft))(Gildersleeve, John)
Related: [-]
34 34 notice Appearance Mon 03/04 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney John W Spiegel on behalf of Defendants Jagjeet S. Bindra, Michael C. Camunez, Vanessa C.L. Chang, Theodore F. Craver, Jr., Edison International, Louis Hernandez, Jr., Ron Litzinger, James T. Morris, Timothy O'Toole, Kevin M. Payne, William M. Petmecky III, Pedro J. Pizarro, Maria Rigatti, Richard T. Schlosberg III, William James Scillaci, Southern California Edison, Linda G. Stuntz, William P. Sullivan, Ellen O. Tauscher, Peter J. Taylor, Brett White (Attorney John W Spiegel added to party Jagjeet S. Bindra(pty:dft), Attorney John W Spiegel added to party Michael C. Camunez(pty:dft), Attorney John W Spiegel added to party Vanessa C.L. Chang(pty:dft), Attorney John W Spiegel added to party Theodore F. Craver, Jr.(pty:dft), Attorney John W Spiegel added to party Edison International (pty:dft), Attorney John W Spiegel added to party Louis Hernandez, Jr.(pty:dft), Attorney John W Spiegel added to party Ron Litzinger(pty:dft), Attorney John W Spiegel added to party James T. Morris(pty:dft), Attorney John W Spiegel added to party Timothy O'Toole(pty:dft), Attorney John W Spiegel added to party Kevin M. Payne(pty:dft), Attorney John W Spiegel added to party William M. Petmecky III(pty:dft), Attorney John W Spiegel added to party Pedro J. Pizarro(pty:dft), Attorney John W Spiegel added to party Maria Rigatti(pty:dft), Attorney John W Spiegel added to party Richard T. Schlosberg III(pty:dft), Attorney John W Spiegel added to party William James Scillaci(pty:dft), Attorney John W Spiegel added to party Southern California Edison (pty:dft), Attorney John W Spiegel added to party Linda G. Stuntz(pty:dft), Attorney John W Spiegel added to party William P. Sullivan(pty:dft), Attorney John W Spiegel added to party Ellen O. Tauscher(pty:dft), Attorney John W Spiegel added to party Peter J. Taylor(pty:dft), Attorney John W Spiegel added to party Brett White(pty:dft))(Spiegel, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
33 33 5 pgs order Order Thu 02/28 4:53 PM
ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED ACTIONS AND APPOINTING CO-LEAD COUNSEL by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re Stipulation to Consolidate Cases, Stipulation for Order32 . The following actions are hereby consolidated for all purposes, including pretrial proceedings and trial, under Case 2:19-cv-00651 (the "Consolidated Action"): Cases associated with Lead Case 2:19cv651 is 2:19cv693 All papers filed in connection with the Consolidated Action wi11 be maintained in one file under Lead Case No. 2:19-cv-00651 SVW. (mrgo) Modified on 2/28/2019 (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 25, 2019
32 32 stip Consolidate Cases Order Mon 02/25 1:23 PM
STIPULATION to Consolidate Cases as to 2:19-cv-00693, STIPULATION for Order Appointing Co-Lead Counsel filed by Plaintiff Stan Kieffer.(Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 14, 2019
31 31 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/14 2:01 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Stan Kieffer. upon Southern California Edison waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. Waiver of Service signed by John M. Gildersleeve. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
30 30 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/14 1:59 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Stan Kieffer. upon Edison International waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. Waiver of Service signed by John M. Gildersleeve. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
29 29 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/14 1:57 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Stan Kieffer. upon Brett White waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. Waiver of Service signed by John M. Gildersleeve. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
28 28 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/14 1:56 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Stan Kieffer. upon Peter J. Taylor waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. Waiver of Service signed by John M. Gildersleeve. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
27 27 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/14 1:54 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Stan Kieffer. upon Ellen O. Tauscher waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. Waiver of Service signed by John M. Gildersleeve. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
26 26 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/14 1:51 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Stan Kieffer. upon William P. Sullivan waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. Waiver of Service signed by John M. Gildersleeve. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
25 25 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/14 1:49 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Stan Kieffer. upon Linda G. Stuntz waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. Waiver of Service signed by John M. Gildersleeve. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/14 1:46 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Stan Kieffer. upon William James Scillaci waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. Waiver of Service signed by John M. Gildersleeve. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
23 23 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/14 1:44 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Stan Kieffer. upon Richard T. Schlosberg III waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. Waiver of Service signed by John M. Gildersleeve. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/14 1:42 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Stan Kieffer. upon William M. Petmecky III waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. Waiver of Service signed by John M. Gildersleeve. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/14 1:39 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Stan Kieffer. upon Kevin M. Payne waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. Waiver of Service signed by John M. Gildersleeve. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/14 1:37 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Stan Kieffer. upon Timothy O'Toole waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. Waiver of Service signed by John M. Gildersleeve. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/14 1:34 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Stan Kieffer. upon James T. Morris waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. Waiver of Service signed by John M. Gildersleeve. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/14 1:32 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Stan Kieffer. upon Ron Litzinger waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. Waiver of Service signed by John M. Gildersleeve. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/14 1:29 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Stan Kieffer. upon Louis Hernandez, Jr. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. Waiver of Service signed by John M. Gildersleeve. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/14 1:27 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Stan Kieffer. upon Theodore F. Craver, Jr. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. Waiver of Service signed by John M. Gildersleeve. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/14 1:21 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Stan Kieffer. upon Vanessa C.L. Chang waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. Waiver of Service signed by John M. Gildersleeve. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/14 1:19 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Stan Kieffer. upon Michael C. Camunez waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. Waiver of Service signed by John M. Gildersleeve. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/14 1:15 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Stan Kieffer. upon Jagjeet S. Bindra waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. Waiver of Service signed by John M. Gildersleeve. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/14 1:06 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Stan Kieffer. upon Maria Rigatti waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. Waiver of Service signed by John M. Gildersleeve. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/14 12:56 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Stan Kieffer. upon Pedro J. Pizarro waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. Waiver of Service signed by John M. Gildersleeve. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 13, 2019
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 02/13 9:46 AM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 12, 2019
9 9 order Transfer Pursuant to GO 16-05 DECLINED-(related case)(CV 34) Tue 02/12 3:12 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05 Related [+] filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:18-cv-09690 CBM(FFMx) (rn)
Related: [-] lated Case
Thursday, January 31, 2019
8 8 cs_rasgn Reassign Case - Self -Recusal --pursuant GO 16-05 (CV-52) Thu 01/31 2:00 PM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Case transferred from Judge R. Gary Klausner to the calendar of Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-00651 SVW(AGRx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 30, 2019
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 01/30 9:28 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Jagjeet S. Bindra, Michael C. Camunez, Vanessa C.L. Chang, Theodore F. Craver, Jr., Edison International, Louis Hernandez, Jr., Ron Litzinger, James T. Morris, Timothy O'Toole, Kevin M. Payne, William M. Petmecky III, Pedro J. Pizarro, Maria Rigatti, Richard T. Schlosberg III, William James Scillaci, Southern California Edison, Linda G. Stuntz, William P. Sullivan, Ellen O. Tauscher, Peter J. Taylor, Brett White. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 01/30 9:20 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 01/30 9:20 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (et)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 28, 2019
4 4 notice Summons Request Mon 01/28 7:24 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Stan Kieffer. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 01/28 7:22 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Stan Kieffer, (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 01/28 7:20 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Stan Kieffer. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 01/28 7:19 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23112908 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Stan Kieffer. (Attorney Laurence M Rosen added to party Stan Kieffer(pty:pla))(Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]