LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. DSA Perfusion, L.L.C.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jerry A Brown |
Case #: | 2:19-ap-01009 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jan 28, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 23, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
DSA Perfusion, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:07 PM CDT |
Thursday, July 23, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 07/23 11:10 AM
Adversary Case Closed 2:19-ap-1009. (McIlwain, A.) |
||
Thursday, July 09, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
miscap
Certificate of Service (PF)
Thu 07/09 4:40 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator |
|
Wednesday, July 08, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Order) (AP)
Wed 07/08 1:42 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Signed on July 8, 2020. (Rouchon, H) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion) (AP)
Wed 07/08 11:47 AM
Ex Parte Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
court
Memo to Record
Thu 03/05 2:31 PM
Memo to Record of TRIAL hearing scheduled for 3/24/2020 |
|
Tuesday, January 14, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
order
Continue Trial (Order) (AP)
Tue 01/14 11:14 AM
Order Granting Motion To Continue Trial On Signed on January 14, 2020. Trial scheduled for 3/24/2020 at 02:00 PM at 500 Poydras Street, Suite B-705 SECTION B . (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Thursday, January 09, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Continue Trial (Motion) (AP)
Thu 01/09 2:27 PM
Motion to Continue Trial on Filed by DSA Perfusion, L.L.C. |
|
Sunday, October 06, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 10/06 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Documen |
|
Friday, October 04, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Set Trial (Order)
Fri 10/04 1:44 PM
Order Setting Trial Signed on October 4, 2019 Trial scheduled for 1/16/2020 at 10:30 AM at 500 Poydras Street, Suite B-705 SECTION B . (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Sunday, September 15, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 09/15 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Documen |
|
Friday, September 13, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
court
Rule 16b Conference and Pre-Trial Conference (AP)
Fri 09/13 1:17 PM
Notice of Rule 16(b) Conference and Pre-Trial Conference. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 10/4/2019 at 09:45 AM at Hale Boggs Federal Building, Room B-741A, 500 Poydras Street. (Matrana, L) |
|
Tuesday, May 21, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
miscap
Document (PF)
Tue 05/21 4:43 PM
Document Exhibit A- Statement Filed by DSA Perfusion, L.L.C. |
|
5 | 5
miscap
Certificate of Service (PF)
Tue 05/21 1:38 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by DSA Perfusion, L.L.C. |
|
Monday, May 20, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint (AP)
Mon 05/20 11:54 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by DSA Perfusion, L.L.C. (Achee, Renee) |
|
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 02/07 4:15 PM
Summons Service Executed on DSA Perfusion, L.L.C. 1/30/2019 . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (AP)
Tue 01/29 10:05 AM
Summons Issued on DSA Perfusion, L.L.C. Answer Due 2/28/2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 01/28 1:31 PM
Adversary case 19-01009 Complaint by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator against DSA Perfusion, L.L.C.. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Manthey, Tristan) |