LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Erato, M.D.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jerry A Brown |
Case #: | 2:19-ap-01015 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jan 28, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 07, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Thaddeus Erato, M.D.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:07 PM CDT |
Tuesday, July 07, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 07/07 8:19 AM
Adversary Case Closed 2:19-ap-1015. (McIlwain, A.) |
||
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
miscap
Certificate of Service (PF)
Mon 06/22 1:03 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator |
|
Thursday, June 18, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Order) (AP)
Thu 06/18 4:25 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Signed on June 18, 2020. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion) (AP)
Thu 06/18 2:47 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 02/08 10:53 AM
Summons Service Executed on Thaddeus Erato, M.D. 1/30/2019 . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (AP)
Tue 01/29 10:15 AM
Summons Issued on Thaddeus Erato, M.D. Answer Due 2/28/2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 01/28 3:46 PM
Adversary case 19-01015 Complaint by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator against Thaddeus Erato, M.D.. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Manthey, Tristan) |