LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Peterson
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jerry A Brown |
Case #: | 2:19-ap-01017 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jan 28, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 24, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Mary Ann Peterson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:07 PM CDT |
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 05/24 2:01 PM
Adversary Case Closed 2:19-ap-1017. (McIlwain, A.) |
||
Thursday, May 09, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Order) (AP)
Thu 05/09 3:07 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. The Motion For Summary Judgment is Moot. Signed on May 9, 2019. (Nunnery, J.) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion) (AP)
Thu 05/09 1:29 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
court
Memo to Record
Tue 04/09 1:46 PM
Memo to Record of hearing scheduled for 5/22/19 |
|
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Hearing (AP)
Mon 04/08 6:35 PM
Notice of Hearing with Certificate of Service Filed by Filed by Mary Ann Peterson |
|
11 | 11
motion
Summary Judgment - Motion (AP)
Mon 04/08 6:33 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment Filed by Mary Ann Peterson (Anderson, Rachel) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum | ||
Att: 2 Statement of Uncontested Facts | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit | ||
Monday, March 18, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
miscap
Certificate of Service (PF)
Mon 03/18 4:01 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Mary Ann Peterson |
|
9 | 9
order
Extend Time (Order) (AP)
Mon 03/18 3:51 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Plead IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on March 18, 2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extend Time (Motion) (AP)
Mon 03/18 10:46 AM
Motion to Extend Time to file Answer or Response Filed by Mary Ann Peterson (Anderson, Rachel) |
|
utility
Reset Answer Deadline (AP)
Mon 03/18 3:52 PM
Mary Ann Peterson Answer Deadline Reset for 4/10/2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
||
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Wed 02/27 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Documen |
|
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
miscap
Certificate of Service (PF)
Mon 02/25 1:52 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Mary Ann Peterson |
|
5 | 5
order
Extend Time (Order)
Mon 02/25 12:03 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Plead Signed on February 25, 2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
4 | 4
motion
03Extend Time
Mon 02/25 11:12 AM
Motion to Extend Time Filed by Rachel Thyre Anderson on behalf of Mary Ann Peterson (Anderson, Rachel) |
|
utility
Reset Answer Deadline (AP)
Mon 02/25 12:04 PM
Mary Ann Peterson Answer Deadline Reset for 3/21/2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
||
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 02/08 10:58 AM
Summons Service Executed on Mary Ann Peterson 1/30/2019 . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (AP)
Tue 01/29 10:18 AM
Summons Issued on Mary Ann Peterson Answer Due 2/28/2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 01/28 3:52 PM
Adversary case 19-01017 Complaint by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator against Mary Ann Peterson. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Manthey, Tristan) |