LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Zimmer, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jerry A Brown |
Case #: | 2:19-ap-01021 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jan 28, 2019 |
Terminated: | Oct 03, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Zimmer, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:07 PM CDT |
Thursday, October 03, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 10/03 9:44 AM
Adversary Case Closed 2:19-ap-1021. (McIlwain, A.) |
||
Wednesday, September 18, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Order) (AP)
Wed 09/18 11:07 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Signed on September 18, 2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Tuesday, September 17, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion) (AP)
Tue 09/17 4:31 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
court
Memo to Record
Fri 08/09 10:32 AM
Memo to Record of Trial scheduled for August 29, 2019 |
|
Monday, April 22, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Relative to Pre Trial (Order) (AP)
Mon 04/22 4:15 PM
Order Relative to Pre Trial Signed on 4/22/19 Trial scheduled for 8/29/2019 at 10:30 AM at 500 Poydras Street, Suite B-705 SECTION B . (Lew, K) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Wed 04/03 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Documen |
|
Monday, April 01, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
court
Rule 16b Conference and Pre-Trial Conference (AP)
Mon 04/01 12:52 PM
Notice of Rule 16(b) Conference and Pre-Trial Conference. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 4/22/2019 at 02:30 PM at Hale Boggs Federal Building, Room B-741A, 500 Poydras Street. (Matrana, L) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2019 | ||
court
Corrective Deficiency Satisfied
Fri 03/29 11:04 AM
Corrective Deficiency Satisfie |
||
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint (AP)
Thu 03/28 10:01 AM
Answer to Complaint to Avoid and Recover Avoidable Transfers Filed by Zimmer, Inc. (Williamson, Stephen) |
|
6 | 6
court
Notice of Deficiency
Thu 03/28 9:13 AM
Notice of Deficiency Certificate of Service must include the names and addresses of parties to be served. See Standing Order 2006-4 and Local Rule 2002-1. The corrected filing must be submitted within 2 business days. Otherwise, the court may issue an order to show cause as to why the document was not corrected, or may strike the pleading. You may contact the court for further procedural information |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint (AP)
Wed 03/27 3:49 PM
Answer to Complaint to Avoid and Recover Avoidable Transfers Filed by Zimmer, Inc. (Williamson, Stephen) |
|
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 02/08 11:11 AM
Summons Service Executed on Zimmer, Inc. 1/31/2019 (Officer/Agent) . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 02/08 11:10 AM
Summons Service Executed on Zimmer, Inc. 1/30/2019 . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (AP)
Tue 01/29 10:25 AM
Summons Issued on Zimmer, Inc. Answer Due 2/28/2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 01/28 4:00 PM
Adversary case 19-01021 Complaint by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator against Zimmer, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Manthey, Tristan) |