LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Eclinical Works, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jerry A Brown |
Case #: | 2:19-ap-01022 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jan 28, 2019 |
Terminated: | Aug 20, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Eclinical Works, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:07 PM CDT |
Tuesday, August 20, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 08/20 11:38 AM
Adversary Case Closed 2:19-ap-1022. (McIlwain, A.) |
||
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
miscap
Certificate of Service (PF)
Wed 07/31 11:07 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator |
|
18 | 18
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Order) (AP)
Wed 07/31 10:53 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Signed on July 31, 2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion) (AP)
Wed 07/31 10:39 AM
Ex Parte Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator (Nobles, Cherie) |
|
Sunday, April 07, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 04/08 6:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Documen |
|
Friday, April 05, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
order
Set Trial (Order)
Fri 04/05 12:08 PM
Order Setting Trial Signed on April 5, 2019 Trial scheduled for 9/16/2019 at 09:00 AM at 500 Poydras Street, Suite B-705 SECTION B . (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
miscap
Certificate of Service (PF)
Wed 03/27 4:49 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Eclinical Works, LLC |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
order
Appear pro hac vice (Order) (AP)
Tue 03/26 1:32 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on March 26, 2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
court
Corrective Deficiency Satisfied
Tue 03/26 9:12 AM
Corrective Deficiency Satisfie |
||
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (Motion) (AP)
Mon 03/25 2:30 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Eclinical Works, LLC (Madison, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit ECF Registration-Eastern District | ||
11 | 11
notice
zNotice (AP)
Mon 03/25 2:25 PM
Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for All Notices and Pleadings Filed by Eclinical Works, LLC (Madison, John) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint (AP)
Mon 03/25 2:22 PM
Answer to Complaint to Avoid And Recover Avoidable Transfers Filed by Eclinical Works, LLC (Madison, John) |
|
9 | 9
court
Notice of Deficiency
Mon 03/25 9:49 AM
Notice of Deficiency Certificate of Service must include the names and addresses of parties to be served. See Standing Order 2006-4 and Local Rule 2002-1. The corrected filing must be submitted within 2 business days. Otherwise, the court may issue an order to show cause as to why the document was not corrected, or may strike the pleading. You may contact the court for further procedural information |
|
Friday, March 22, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (Motion) (AP)
Fri 03/22 10:59 AM
Ex Parte Motion to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Eclinical Works, LLC (Madison, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Good Standing Certificate | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit ECF Registration-Eastern District | ||
7 | 7
notice
zNotice (AP)
Fri 03/22 10:33 AM
Notice Of Appearance of Counsel and Request for All Notices and Pleadings Filed by Eclinical Works, LLC (Madison, John) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
Rule 16b Conference and Pre-Trial Conference (AP)
Mon 03/18 1:01 PM
Notice of Rule 16(b) Conference and Pre-Trial Conference. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 4/5/2019 at 10:15 AM at Hale Boggs Federal Building, Room B-741A, 500 Poydras Street. (Matrana, L) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint (AP)
Fri 03/15 3:13 PM
Answer to Complaint To Avoid and Recover Avoidable Transfers Filed by Eclinical Works, LLC (Madison, John) |
|
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 02/08 11:14 AM
Summons Service Executed on Eclinical Works, LLC 1/31/2019 (Officer/Agent) . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 02/08 11:13 AM
Summons Service Executed on Eclinical Works, LLC 1/30/2019 . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (AP)
Tue 01/29 10:26 AM
Summons Issued on Eclinical Works, LLC Answer Due 2/28/2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 01/28 5:24 PM
Adversary case 19-01022 Complaint by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator against Eclinical Works, LLC. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Manthey, Tristan) |