LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Crescent Imaging, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jerry A Brown |
Case #: | 2:19-ap-01024 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jan 28, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 21, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Crescent Imaging, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 06 2020
Memorandum Opinion. Signed on July 6, 2020 (RE: related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator) (McIlwain, A.) |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:07 PM CDT |
Wednesday, July 22, 2020 | ||
court
Disposal of Exhibits (Returned or Destroyed)
Wed 07/22 12:49 PM
In accordance with Local Rule 9017-1(C), the exhibits admitted into evidence at the trial held on 2/12/20 have been DESTROYED |
||
Tuesday, July 21, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 07/21 2:47 PM
Adversary Case Closed 2:19-ap-1024. (McIlwain, A.) |
||
Thursday, July 09, 2020 | ||
36 | 36
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 07/09 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Documen |
|
35 | 35
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 07/09 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Documen |
|
Monday, July 06, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
order
Judgment (Sua Sponte) (Order)
Mon 07/06 4:51 PM
Judgment Signed on July 6, 2020 (McIlwain, A.) |
|
33 | 33
8
pgs
order
Opinion (LAEB)
Mon 07/06 4:50 PM
Memorandum Opinion. Signed on July 6, 2020 (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Friday, March 20, 2020 | ||
32 | 32
order
Leave (Order) (AP)
Fri 03/20 8:15 AM
Order Granting Motion For Leave to File Sur-Reply IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on March 20, 2020. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Leave (Motion) (AP)
Thu 03/19 2:02 PM
Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Filed by Crescent Imaging, LLC |
|
Wednesday, March 18, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
answer
Reply
Wed 03/18 12:08 PM
Reply with Certificate of Service Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator |
|
Wednesday, March 11, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
miscap
Brief Memorandum (PF)
Wed 03/11 11:18 AM
Post-Trial Brief Memorandum Filed by Crescent Imaging, LLC |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
miscap
Brief Memorandum (PF)
Wed 02/26 4:24 PM
Post-Trial Brief Memorandum Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator |
|
Friday, February 14, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 02/14 11:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Documen |
|
Wednesday, February 12, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
order
Relative to Trial (Order)
Wed 02/12 3:09 PM
Order Setting Deadlines Relative to Trial Signed on February 12, 2020 (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit List | ||
Friday, February 07, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 02/07 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Documen |
|
Wednesday, February 05, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
miscap
Pre-Trial Order (PF)
Wed 02/05 6:16 PM
Pre-Trial Order Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
23 | 23
miscap
Pre-Trial Order (PF)
Wed 02/05 6:15 PM
Pre-Trial Order Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator (Landis, Michael) |
|
22 | 22
order
Continue Trial (Order) (AP)
Wed 02/05 10:49 AM
Order Denying Motion To Continue Trial Signed on February 5, 2020. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Tuesday, February 04, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Continue Trial (Motion) (AP)
Tue 02/04 5:04 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Continue Trial on February 12, 2020 Filed by Crescent Imaging, LLC |
|
Sunday, January 05, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 01/05 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Documen |
|
Saturday, January 04, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 01/04 11:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Documen |
|
Friday, January 03, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
order
Summary Judgment (Order)
Fri 01/03 3:17 PM
Order Denying Motion For Summary Judgment Signed on January 3, 2020. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
order
Leave (Order) (AP)
Thu 01/02 2:57 PM
Order Granting Motion For Leave to File Reply Memorandum Signed on January 2, 2020. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Leave (Motion) (AP)
Thu 01/02 10:52 AM
Motion for Leave Filed by Crescent Imaging, LLC |
|
Tuesday, December 31, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
miscap
Statement of Contested Facts (PF)
Tue 12/31 9:30 AM
Statement of Contested Facts Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator |
|
Monday, December 30, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Leave (Motion) (AP)
Mon 12/30 3:24 PM
Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Crescent Imaging, LLC |
|
Thursday, December 26, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Opposition
Thu 12/26 3:19 PM
Opposition with Certificate of Service Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator |
|
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Hearing (AP)
Mon 12/09 11:54 AM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Filed by Crescent Imaging, LLC |
|
Thursday, December 05, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Summary Judgment - Motion (AP)
Thu 12/05 2:20 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment Filed by Crescent Imaging, LLC (Bruno, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E | ||
Att: 7 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 9 Notice of Hearing | ||
Sunday, October 06, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 10/06 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Documen |
|
Friday, October 04, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Set Trial (Order)
Fri 10/04 1:48 PM
Order Setting Trial Signed on October 4, 2019 Trial scheduled for 2/12/2020 at 09:00 AM at 500 Poydras Street, Suite B-705 SECTION B . (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Sunday, September 15, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 09/15 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Documen |
|
Friday, September 13, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
court
Rule 16b Conference and Pre-Trial Conference (AP)
Fri 09/13 1:19 PM
Notice of Rule 16(b) Conference and Pre-Trial Conference. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 10/4/2019 at 10:15 AM at Hale Boggs Federal Building, Room B-741A, 500 Poydras Street. (Matrana, L) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint (AP)
Fri 07/19 10:49 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Crescent Imaging, LLC (Bruno, Joseph) |
|
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 02/08 11:21 AM
Summons Service Executed on Crescent Imaging, LLC 1/31/2019 (Officer/Agent) . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 02/08 11:20 AM
Summons Service Executed on Crescent Imaging, LLC 1/30/2019 . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 02/08 11:18 AM
Summons Service Executed on Crescent Imaging, LLC 1/30/2019 . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (AP)
Tue 01/29 10:29 AM
Summons Issued on Crescent Imaging, LLC Answer Due 2/28/2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 01/28 5:29 PM
Adversary case 19-01024 Complaint by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator against Crescent Imaging, LLC. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Manthey, Tristan) |