Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-30560

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:19-ap-03168
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2019
Terminated:Jul 07, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Lufkin Industries, LLC
601 South Raguet
Lufkin, TX 75901
Represented By
Lufkin Industries, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Vanguard Natural Resources, LLC
PO Box 546
Canton, TX 75103
Represented By
Kara E. Casteel
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Sunday, July 07, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Sun 07/07 7:17 PM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3168 Closed. (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2019
18 18 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Wed 07/03 8:42 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Vanguard Natural Resources, LLC (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2019
17 17 misc Withdraw Document Mon 04/01 9:46 AM
Withdraw Document (Filed By Lufkin Industries, LLC ) Related [+] (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
16 16 misc Withdraw Document Mon 04/01 9:44 AM
Withdraw Document (Filed By Lufkin Industries, LLC ) Related [+] (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference
Friday, March 29, 2019
15 15 notice Notice Fri 03/29 1:50 PM
Notice of Settlement . Filed by Vanguard Natural Resources, LLC (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2019
14 14 answer Response Wed 03/27 2:44 PM
Response /Memorandum of Law in Opposition Related [+]. Filed by Vanguard Natural Resources, LLC (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference
13 13 answer Response Wed 03/27 2:25 PM
Response Related [+]. Filed by Vanguard Natural Resources, LLC (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Friday, March 15, 2019
12 12 notice Notice Fri 03/15 8:39 AM
Notice of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss . Related [+] Filed by Lufkin Industries, LLC (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thursday, March 14, 2019
court Hearing Set Thu 03/14 6:23 PM
Hearing Set On Related [+] Movant to give notice of hearing. Hearing scheduled for 4/3/2019 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
11 11 notice Notice Wed 03/06 3:02 PM
Notice of Hearing . Related [+] Filed by Lufkin Industries, LLC (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference
10 10 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 03/06 3:00 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Lufkin Industries, LLC (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Final Decree Closing Case
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Order Confirming Plan
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Plan
9 9 motion Withdrawal of Reference Wed 03/06 2:58 PM
Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Fee Amount: $ 181. Filed by Lufkin Industries, LLC Hearing scheduled for 4/3/2019 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Jury Demand Wed 03/06 2:57 PM
Jury Demand (Filed By Lufkin Industries, LLC ). (Guerrero, Aaron)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Wed 03/06 3:47 PM
Receipt of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference 19-03168 [motion,mwdrefad] ( 181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20928952. Fee amount $ 181.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 07, 2019
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 02/07 3:46 PM
Summons Service Executed on Lufkin Industries, LLC 2/7/2019. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 04, 2019
6 6 court Summons Issued Mon 02/04 10:20 AM
Summons Issued on Lufkin Industries, LLC Date Issued 2/4/2019. (SarahShelby)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 01, 2019
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/01 11:59 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 02/01/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Conference
4 4 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Fri 02/01 2:30 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Lufkin Industries, LLC. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 31, 2019
3 3 misc Certificate Thu 01/31 11:42 AM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Vanguard Natural Resources, LLC ) Related [+] (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Conference
Wednesday, January 30, 2019
crditcrd none Wed 01/30 7:17 AM
Receipt of Complaint 19-03168 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20817840. Fee amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 29, 2019
2 2 2 pgs order Order for Conference (FORM) (MULTI) Tue 01/29 5:49 PM
Order for Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/22/2019 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Tue 01/29 12:26 PM
Adversary case 19-03168 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Complaint by Vanguard Natural Resources, LLC against Lufkin Industries, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A