Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:19-mc-00011
Nature of Suit111 Civil - Miscellaneous
CauseDisbarment Proceedings
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2019
Terminated:Jan 29, 2019

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 77 minutes ago
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
5 5 order Final Discipline Order Wed 02/27 4:28 PM
ORDER THAT RESPONDENT IS PLACED ON TEMPORARY SUSPENSION FROM THE PRACTICE OF LAW IN THIS COURT, EFFECTIVE THIRTY DAYS FROM JANUARY 23 2019, AND UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 02/27/19. 02/27/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND MAILED AND E-MAILED TO S. STRETTON, ESQUIRE. (go,)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 26, 2019
4 4 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Tue 02/26 3:03 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by FRANKLIN ALBERT BENNETT, III. (STRETTON, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/26 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SAMUEL C. STRETTON on behalf of FRANKLIN ALBERT BENNETT, III with Certificate of Service(STRETTON, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 04, 2019
2 2 1 pgs order Order Mon 02/04 2:19 PM
ORDER THAT THE RESPONDENT FILE WITH THIS COURT, WITHIN 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF SERVICE OF THIS ORDER, AN ANSWER INFORMING THIS COURT OF ANY CLAIM BY THE RESPONDENT, PREDICATED UPON THE GROUNDS SET FORTH IN L.R.C.P. 83.6 11 D, THAT THE IMPOSITION OF IDENTICAL DISCIPLINE BY THIS COURT WOULD BE UNWARRANTED, AND THE REASONS THEREFORE. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 02/04/19. 02/04/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE. (go,)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 29, 2019
1 1 misc Certified Copy of Order Tue 01/29 4:10 PM
Copy of Order from the Supreme Court of Pennsylvania dated January 23, 2019, following review of the responses to a rule to show cause why Franklin Albert Bennett, III, should not be placed on temporary suspension, the Rule is made absolute. Franklin Albert Bennett, III, is placed on temporary suspension. See Pa.R.D.E. 214(d)(2), He shall comply with all the provisions of Pa.R.D.E. 217. Respondent's right to petition for dissolution or amendment of this Order and to request accelerated disposition of charges underlying this Order pursuant to Pa.R.D.E. 214(f)(2) are specifically preserved. (go,)
Related: [-]