LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jerry A Brown |
Case #: | 2:19-ap-01031 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jan 29, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 14, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:07 PM CDT |
Friday, June 14, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 06/14 2:10 PM
Adversary Case Closed 2:19-ap-1031. (McIlwain, A.) |
||
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
miscap
Certificate of Service (PF)
Thu 05/30 3:06 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator |
|
6 | 6
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Order) (AP)
Thu 05/30 12:51 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Signed on May 30, 2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion) (AP)
Thu 05/30 11:26 AM
Ex Parte Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 02/08 11:39 AM
Summons Service Executed on Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. 1/30/2019 (Officer/Agent) . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 02/08 11:38 AM
Summons Service Executed on Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. 1/30/2019 . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (AP)
Wed 01/30 8:34 AM
Summons Issued on Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc. Answer Due 3/1/2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/29 1:34 PM
Adversary case 19-01031 Complaint by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator against Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems Inc.. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Manthey, Tristan) |