LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Uptodate, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jerry A Brown |
Case #: | 2:19-ap-01032 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jan 29, 2019 |
Terminated: | Nov 05, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Uptodate, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:07 PM CDT |
Thursday, November 05, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 11/05 10:41 AM
Adversary Case Closed 2:19-ap-1032. (McIlwain, A.) |
||
Wednesday, October 14, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Order) (AP)
Wed 10/14 8:14 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Signed on October 13, 2020. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Monday, October 12, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion) (AP)
Mon 10/12 1:58 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
Thursday, August 27, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 08/27 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Documen |
|
Tuesday, August 25, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
order
Transferring Case Judge Assignment (Order)
Tue 08/25 12:43 PM
Order Transferring Case Judge Assignment, Involvement of Jerry A. Brown Terminated Judge Douglas D. Dodd assigned to the case. Signed on August 25, 2020 (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Thursday, July 09, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
court
Memo to Record (AP)
Thu 07/09 6:43 AM
Memo to Record . This matter is settled and a dismissal order will be entered by 7/31/20. (Matrana, L) |
|
Sunday, March 08, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 03/09 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Documen |
|
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
court
Trial (AP)
Fri 03/06 11:48 AM
Trial. Trial scheduled for 7/16/2020 at 02:00 PM at 500 Poydras Street, Suite B-705 SECTION B . (Arnold, Ellen) |
|
Friday, February 14, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 02/14 11:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Documen |
|
Wednesday, February 12, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
court
Rule 16b Conference and Pre-Trial Conference (AP)
Wed 02/12 9:31 AM
Notice of Rule 16(b) Conference and Pre-Trial Conference. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 3/6/2020 at 10:30 AM at Hale Boggs Federal Building, Room B-741A, 500 Poydras Street. (Arnold, Ellen) |
|
Monday, October 07, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint (AP)
Mon 10/07 4:45 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Uptodate, Inc. (Segrist, Peter) |
|
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 02/08 11:42 AM
Summons Service Executed on Uptodate, Inc. 1/31/2019 (Officer/Agent) . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 02/08 11:41 AM
Summons Service Executed on Uptodate, Inc. 1/31/2019 . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (AP)
Wed 01/30 8:36 AM
Summons Issued on Uptodate, Inc. Answer Due 3/1/2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/29 1:37 PM
Adversary case 19-01032 Complaint by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator against Uptodate, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Manthey, Tristan) |