LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Bruce Kerry, M.D.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jerry A Brown |
Case #: | 2:19-ap-01037 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jan 29, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 06, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Bruce Kerry, M.D.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:07 PM CDT |
Monday, July 06, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 07/06 1:03 PM
Adversary Case Closed 2:19-ap-1037. (McIlwain, A.) |
||
Wednesday, June 17, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
miscap
Certificate of Service (PF)
Wed 06/17 12:04 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator |
|
Tuesday, June 16, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Order) (AP)
Tue 06/16 4:11 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Signed on 6/16/20. (Lew, K) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion) (AP)
Tue 06/16 2:00 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 02/08 11:58 AM
Summons Service Executed on Bruce Kerry, M.D. 1/31/2019 . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (AP)
Wed 01/30 8:47 AM
Summons Issued on Bruce Kerry, M.D. Answer Due 3/1/2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/29 4:31 PM
Adversary case 19-01037 Complaint by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator against Bruce Kerry, M.D.. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Manthey, Tristan) |