LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Northlake Anesthesiologists, A Professional Medica
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jerry A Brown |
Case #: | 2:19-ap-01038 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2019 |
Terminated: | Sep 13, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Northlake Anesthesiologists, A Professional Medical Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:07 PM CDT |
Friday, September 13, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 09/13 9:33 AM
Adversary Case Closed 2:19-ap-1038. (McIlwain, A.) |
||
Thursday, August 29, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
miscap
Certificate of Service (PF)
Thu 08/29 11:56 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator |
|
16 | 16
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Order) (AP)
Thu 08/29 11:15 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Signed on August 29, 2019. (Nunnery, J.) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion) (AP)
Wed 08/28 4:30 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Counterclaim (AP)
Tue 07/02 5:19 PM
Answer to Counterclaim Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
Tuesday, May 07, 2019 | ||
court
Corrective Deficiency Satisfied
Tue 05/07 8:25 AM
Corrective Deficiency Satisfie |
||
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
miscap
Certificate of Service (PF)
Mon 05/06 1:17 PM
First Amended Certificate of Service Filed by Northlake Anesthesiologists, A Professional Medical Corporation |
|
Thursday, May 02, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
court
Notice of Deficiency
Thu 05/02 8:52 AM
Notice of Deficiency Certificate of Service must include the names and addresses of parties to be served. See Standing Order 2006-4 and Local Rule 2002-1. The corrected filing must be submitted within 2 business days. Otherwise, the court may issue an order to show cause as to why the document was not corrected, or may strike the pleading. You may contact the court for further procedural information |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
answer|cmp
Answer to Complaint (AP)|Counterclaim
Wed 05/01 3:19 PM
Answer to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim , Counterclaim by Northlake Anesthesiologists, A Professional Medical Corporation against LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator Filed by Northlake Anesthesiologists, A Professional Medical Corporation (Briggett, Joseph) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Extend Time (Order) (AP)
Fri 03/29 3:39 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Plead IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on March 29, 2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Extend Time (Motion) (AP)
Fri 03/29 1:55 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time and Reset Deadline for Defendant to File Responsive Pleadings Filed by Northlake Anesthesiologists, A Professional Medical Corporation (Briggett, Joseph) |
|
utility
Reset Answer Deadline (AP)
Fri 03/29 3:41 PM
Northlake Anesthesiologists, A Professional Medical Corporation Answer Deadline Reset for 5/1/2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
||
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
order
Extend Time (Order) (AP)
Fri 03/01 11:38 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Plead. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on March 1, 2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Extend Time (Motion) (AP)
Fri 03/01 8:50 AM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time with Consent to Extend and Reset Deadline for Defendant to File Responsive Pleadings Filed by Northlake Anesthesiologists, A Professional Medical Corporation (Briggett, Joseph) |
|
utility
Reset Answer Deadline (AP)
Fri 03/01 11:39 AM
Northlake Anesthesiologists, A Professional Medical Corporation Answer Deadline Reset for 4/1/2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
||
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 02/08 1:57 PM
Summons Service Executed on Northlake Anesthesiologists, A Professional Medical Corporation 2/1/2019 (c/o C. Sweat) . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 02/08 1:56 PM
Summons Service Executed on Northlake Anesthesiologists, A Professional Medical Corporation 2/1/2019 (c/o J. Briggett) . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 02/08 1:55 PM
Summons Service Executed on Northlake Anesthesiologists, A Professional Medical Corporation 2/1/2019 (Officer/Agent) . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 02/08 1:53 PM
Summons Service Executed on Northlake Anesthesiologists, A Professional Medical Corporation 2/1/2019 . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (AP)
Thu 01/31 9:24 AM
Summons Issued on Northlake Anesthesiologists, A Professional Medical Corporation Answer Due 3/4/2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/30 10:26 AM
Adversary case 19-01038 Complaint by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator against Northlake Anesthesiologists, A Professional Medical Corporation. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
crditcrd
none
Wed 01/30 4:51 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-01038 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 6521088, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |